Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1489731

EP1489731 - A circuit for controlling inductive loads, in particular of electro actuators, at high efficiency [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
Strada Torino, 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
[2015/37]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni
Strada Torino, 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Faggioli, Eugenio
Via Bogino 25
10123 Torino / IT
02 / Groppo, Riccardo
Strada Torino 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
03 / Santero, Paolo
Strada Torino 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
04 / De Giacomo, Fabio
Strada Torino 50
10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Quinterno, Giuseppe , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[2015/37]
Former [2004/52]Quinterno, Giuseppe , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date04014067.516.06.2004
[2004/52]
Priority number, dateIT2003TO0045217.06.2003         Original published format: IT TO20030452
[2004/52]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489731
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1489731
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/20, H01F7/18, H02M3/158, H02M1/00, H02M3/155
[2015/15]
Former International [2004/52]H02M3/158, H01F7/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/37]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zum hocheffizienten Steuern induktiver Lasten, insbesondere für Elektroaktautoren[2004/52]
English:A circuit for controlling inductive loads, in particular of electro actuators, at high efficiency[2004/52]
French:Circuit pour commander des charges inductives à haute efficacité, en particulier pour actionneurs électriques.[2004/52]
Examination procedure13.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/32]
25.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2015Fee for grant paid
03.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2008
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.06.2004
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU16.06.2004
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/14]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI09.09.2015
GR10.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US6157095  (NAMUDURI CHANDRA SEKHAR [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP1717824
by applicantUS6157095
 US5995356