EP1491153 - Treatment tool for endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Keita 1-26-2-401, Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakada, Mamoru 507-4-713, Takahata Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014581.5 | 22.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20030179648 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003179648 | JP20040154682 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004154682 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491153 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491153 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B10/06 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2901 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2902 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behandlungswerkzeug für ein Endoskop | [2005/01] | English: | Treatment tool for endoscope | [2005/01] | French: | Outil de traitement pour un endoscope | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5228451 (BALES THOMAS O [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [XY]US5254130 (PONCET PHILIPPE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 36 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]EP0738501 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 4, lines 26-29 *; | [Y]US6010523 (SABIN PIERRE JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 3,4 * figures 1-4 * |