Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1493646

EP1493646 - Stroller for children or dolls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2010
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hartan Kinderwagenwerk e.K.
Mühlenweg 1
96242 Sonnefeld-Gestungshausen / DE
[2009/10]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Firma Joh. Georg Hartan
Kronacher Strasse 48
96242 Sonnefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hartan, Rolf
Klausenweg 6
96242 Sonnefeld / DE
02 / Wittig, Reinhard
Pfeifersberg 13
96523 Steinach / DE
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner Blaumeier
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/01]Blaumeier, Jörg
Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109
90101 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/12]LINDER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/01]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date04015017.925.06.2004
[2005/01]
Priority number, dateDE200313020703.07.2003         Original published format: DE 10330207
[2005/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1493646
Date:05.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1493646
Date:03.10.2007
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1493646
Date:16.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:B62B7/10
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/01]
TitleGerman:Kinder- oder Puppenwagen[2005/01]
English:Stroller for children or dolls[2005/01]
French:Voiture d'enfant ou de poupée[2005/01]
Examination procedure16.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
11.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2009Fee for grant paid
03.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
TR16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
HU17.06.2010
AT25.06.2010
CZ25.06.2010
GB25.06.2010
LU25.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
HU17.06.2010
AT25.06.2010
CZ25.06.2010
GB25.06.2010
LU25.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2012/42]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
HU17.06.2010
AT25.06.2010
CZ25.06.2010
GB25.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/43]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
AT25.06.2010
CZ25.06.2010
GB25.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/32]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
CZ25.06.2010
GB25.06.2010
BE30.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/20]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
CZ25.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/14]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
IT16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
CZ25.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/10]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
CZ25.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/07]CY16.12.2009
DK16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/49]CY16.12.2009
EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
GR17.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
Former [2010/39]EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
SK16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
Former [2010/35]EE16.12.2009
FI16.12.2009
IE16.12.2009
RO16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
BG16.03.2010
ES27.03.2010
PT16.04.2010
Former [2010/32]FI16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
ES27.03.2010
Former [2010/23]FI16.12.2009
SI16.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[PX]US2003193172  (LIN WANG-HSIN [TW]) [PX] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure 3a *;
 [X]DE20016773U  (LINK TREASURE LTD [VG]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11 * page 5, line 13 - line 26; figure 2 *;
 [X]US3075783  (FLAM FREDERICK H) [X] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 49; figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]GB2204282  (SPORT BABY LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE29819218U