Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1496182

EP1496182 - Sliding door system with a plurality of sliding door panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.10.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Frunz, Eduard
Via San Michele 64
6987 Caslano / CH
[2011/09]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
FRUBAU di Frunz Eduard
Via Salici
6987 Caslano / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Frunz, Eduard
Via Salici
6987 Caslano / CH
02 / Ehrenberg, Kurt
Via Principale/Sin Tea 1
6914 Carona / CH
 [2005/02]
Representative(s)Hübner, Gerd
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstraße 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/02]Hübner, Gerd, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date04015745.505.07.2004
[2005/02]
Priority number, dateDE2003103077207.07.2003         Original published format: DE 10330772
[2005/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1496182
Date:12.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1496182
Date:01.10.2008
[2008/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1496182
Date:24.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:E05D15/06
[2005/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/02]
TitleGerman:Schiebetürenanlage mit mehreren Schiebetüren[2005/02]
English:Sliding door system with a plurality of sliding door panels[2005/02]
French:Système de portes coulissantes avec une pluralité de panneaux coulissants[2005/02]
Examination procedure21.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
07.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2010Fee for grant paid
03.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  01.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Insolvenzverwalterin Rechtsanwältin Geske, Anja (handelnd für GRABO GmbH)
Herbert-Jensch-Straße 111
15234 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
 [2016/37]
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  01.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Insolvenzverwalterin Rechtsanwältin Geske, Anja (handelnd für GRABO GmbH)
Herbert-Jensch-Straße 111
15234 Frankfurt (Oder) / DE
Former [2015/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  01.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GRABO GmbH
Pfaffendorfer Chaussee 38
15848 Rietz-Neuendorf / DE
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  01.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GRABO GmbH
Pfaffendorfer Chaussee 38
15848 Rietz-Neuendorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/40]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  01.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GRABO GmbH
Pfaffendorfer Chaussee 38
15848 Rietz-Neuendorf / DE
Opponent's representative
von Oppen, Joachim F.M., et al
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Straße 2
10178 Berlin / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
30.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.05.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition08.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2621/16
14.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
18.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
DK31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
GB05.07.2018
SE06.07.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
DK31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
GB05.07.2018
Former [2018/35]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
DK31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
Former [2018/29]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
Former [2018/23]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
NL01.08.2017
Former [2013/45]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/44]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
LU05.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2011/38]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/35]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/32]CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
PT24.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9308355  (SJOEHOLM JARMO [FI]) [X] 1,6,7 * page 8, line 3 - line 36 * * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 4; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]WO0104446  (NORDISKA BALCO AB [SE], et al) [A] 2 * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 3; figures 1-8 *
by applicantWO9308355