Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1475738

EP1475738 - Contactless IC card, responding method, and program therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.08.2012  [2012/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2004/46]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakabe, Futoshi
8-22-14, Nishihara
Asaminami-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
02 / Kawano, Shinji
1-18-9-603, Minori
Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5137 / JP
03 / Masaki, Tadakatsu
24-6-407, Sukezane
Saijo-cho
Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
 [2011/38]
Former [2005/03]01 / Nakabe, Futoshi
8-22-14, Nishihara Asaminami-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
02 / Kawano, Shinji
1-18-9-603, Minori Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5137 / JP
03 / Masaki, Tadakatsu
24-6-407, Sukezane Saijo-cho
Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
Former [2004/46]01 / Nakabe, Futoshi
8-22-14, Nishihara Asaminami-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
02 / Kawano, Shinji
3-3-7, No. 402, Rakurakuen Saeki-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
03 / Masaki, Tadakatsu
24-6-407, Sukezane Saijo-cho
Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/46]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date04015818.012.10.2001
[2004/46]
Priority number, dateJP2000031315013.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000313150
[2004/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1475738
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1475738
Date:17.11.2004
[2004/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1475738
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00, G06K19/077
[2004/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/46]
TitleGerman:Kontaktlose Chipkarte, Antwortverfahren und entsprechendes Programm[2004/46]
English:Contactless IC card, responding method, and program therefor[2004/46]
French:Carte à puce sans contact, procédé à réponse et programme correspondant[2004/46]
Examination procedure20.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
24.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2011Fee for grant paid
05.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01308731.7  / EP1197909
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010308731) is  05.05.2003
Opposition(s)22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US6040786  (FUJIOKA SHUZO) [A] 1-5 * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 18; figures 7-9 * * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 12 *;
 [A]US6002344  (ARNESON MICHAEL R ET AL) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 41 - line 48 *;
 [A]JPH09198471  ;
 [A]WO9405131  (UTICS CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09198471 A 19970731 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 2 *