Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1500686

EP1500686 - Rust inhibitive treatment method for metals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/04]Chromium-free water reducible rust inhibitive paint for metals
[2011/02]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoden Seimitsu Kako Kenkyusho Co., Ltd.
3110, Iiyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0213 / JP
[2011/28]
Former [2005/04]For all designated states
Hoden Seimitsu Kako Kenkyusho Co., Ltd.
3110, Iiyama
Atsugi-shi, Kangawa 243-0213 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Endo, Yasuhiko
24-30, Higashi-Hongo 2-chome, Midori-Ku
Yokohama 226-0002 / JP
02 / Sakai, Tomio
1507, Kusunokiajima 3-chome, Kita-Ku
Nagoya 462-0014 / JP
03 / Takase, Kengo
257-4, Minami-Shimohara-cho
Kasugai 486-0841 / JP
 [2005/04]
Representative(s)Panten, Kirsten , et al
2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/04]Panten, Kirsten , et al
Reichel & Reichel, Patentanwälte, Parkstrasse 13
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date04016843.716.07.2004
[2005/04]
Priority number, dateJP2003027728422.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003277284
JP2003041420812.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003414208
JP2004004744724.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004047447
[2005/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1500686
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1500686
Date:13.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/10
[2005/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/41]
Former [2005/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rostinhibierendes Behandlungsverfahren für Metalle[2011/02]
English:Rust inhibitive treatment method for metals[2011/02]
French:Méthode de traitement antirouille pour métaux[2011/02]
Former [2005/04]Chromfreier wasserverdünnbarer rostinhibierender Lack für Metalle
Former [2005/04]Chromium-free water reducible rust inhibitive paint for metals
Former [2005/04]Peinture antirouille pour métaux diluable à l'eau exempte de chrome
Examination procedure23.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/21]
09.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2011Fee for grant paid
01.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2012  18.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
EWALD DÖRKEN AG
Wetterstrasse 58
58313 Herdecke / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalkoff & Partner
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
 02  13.04.2012  18.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
NOF Metal Coatings Europe
120, rue Galilée ZAET de Creil / Saint-Maximin
60100 Creil / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau, et al
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 [2012/51]
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2012  18.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
EWALD DÖRKEN AG
Wetterstrasse 58
58313 Herdecke / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalkoff & Partner
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
 02  13.04.2012  18.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
NOF Metal Coatings Europe
120, rue Galilée ZAET de Creil / Saint-Maximin
60100 Creil / FR
Opponent's representative
Ahner, Francis, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
24.05.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.02.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.09.2011
GB13.10.2011
DE01.02.2012
[2015/21]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1233043  (METAL COATINGS INT INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0022] - [0025]; claims 12,13 *;
 [A]EP1199339  (METAL COATINGS INT INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] - [0024] * * column 7, lines 35-41, paragraph 40 *;
 [A]EP0939111  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0014] - [0025] , [0027] , [0028] *;
 [A]US4891394  (SAVIN RONALD R [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, lines 25-48 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 44 * * column 9, lines 1-3 *
by applicantUS3907608
 EP1233043