Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1471657

EP1471657 - Transmission of Additional Dedicated Physical Control CHannel (ADPCCH) in W-CDMA system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Niwano, Kazuhito
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2004/44]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date04016854.421.08.2002
[2004/44]
Priority number, dateJP2002002046529.01.2002         Original published format: JP 2002020465
[2004/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1471657
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1471657
Date:03.11.2004
[2004/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1471657
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707
[2004/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/29]
Former [2004/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Übertragung eines Additional Dedicated Physical Control CHannel (ADPCCH) in einem W-CDMA System[2004/44]
English:Transmission of Additional Dedicated Physical Control CHannel (ADPCCH) in W-CDMA system[2004/44]
French:Transmission d'un Additional Dedicated Physical Control CHannel (ADPCCH) dans un système à W-CDMA[2004/44]
Examination procedure17.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/44]
22.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2006Fee for grant paid
07.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02762821.3  / EP1471676
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1089458  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [A] * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0191395  (SICOM INC ;COCHRAN BRUCE A (US)) [A] * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 2 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 7; figure 2 *
 [A]  - 3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; High Speed Downlink Packet Access; Physical Layer Aspects (Release 5), 3GPP TR 25.858 V1.0.0, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 1,3-23, (200112), XP002192345 [A] * paragraph [8.2.2.1]; figure 10 *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, Amplitude differences between uplink DPCCH and DPDCHs, (199904), XP002167844 [A] * the whole document *