EP1500534 - Vehicle ventilation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand - La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil St Denis Cedex / FR | [2006/29] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Osamu c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 02 /
Nozawa, Kazuo c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 03 /
Ben Fredj, Mounir c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 04 /
Katchi, Kazuhisa c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 05 /
Tsubakida, Toshio c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 06 /
Hara, Shinichi c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 07 /
Yoshida, Akihiko c/o Zexel Valeo Climate Control 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | [2005/04] | Application number, filing date | 04017262.9 | 22.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | JP20030278056 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003278056 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1500534 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1500534 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500534 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B60H1/248 (EP);
B60H1/008 (EP);
B60H1/00821 (EP);
B60H2001/00178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | Belüftungseinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2005/04] | English: | Vehicle ventilation system | [2005/04] | French: | Dispositif de ventilation pour un véhicule | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | GB | 22.07.2011 | IE | 22.07.2011 | LU | 22.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
GB | 22.07.2011 | ||
IE | 22.07.2011 | ||
LU | 22.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
GB | 22.07.2011 | ||
IE | 22.07.2011 | ||
LU | 22.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
GB | 22.07.2011 | ||
IE | 22.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
GB | 22.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4201164 (NALDEC KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * columns 3-5; figures 5,9; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0560673 (IMRA EUROPE SA [FR]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, lines 10-22,40-51 - columns 4,5; figures 1,6; claim 13 *; | [A]FR2784943 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 1-20* columns 3-4; figure 1; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | JPS5822308U | JPS61143211 | JPH02256510 | JPH0338134 | EP0560673 |