EP1510743 - Coupling pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steffl, Udo Kehrleiten 24 95466 Weidenberg / DE | [2005/09] | Application number, filing date | 04017264.5 | 22.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | DE2003135889 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335889 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510743 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1510743 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/127, F16L11/04, C08L77/00, C08L77/02, C08L77/06, C08K3/00, C08K3/34, C08K3/36 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F16L9/12 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08K3/346 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L25/00 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L25/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2005/09] | F16L9/127, C08L77/00, C08L77/02, C08K3/00, C08K3/34, C08K3/36 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/27] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungsleitung | [2005/09] | English: | Coupling pipe | [2005/09] | French: | Conduit tubulaire de raccordement | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0775728 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0823455 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]WO9914273 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * |