EP1508711 - Overmolded yoke assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. One Dauch Drive Detroit, MI 48211-1198 / US | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prucher, Bryan Paul 52 N. Main Clarkston, Michigan 48346 / US | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Vernout, Robert, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/08] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019790.7 | 20.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | US20030646237 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: US 646237 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508711 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508711 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/38 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
F16D3/387 (EP,US);
F16C11/06 (KR);
F16D3/41 (EP);
Y10S464/902 (EP,US);
Y10S464/903 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Übergegossene Gabelkopfanordnung | [2005/08] | English: | Overmolded yoke assembly | [2005/08] | French: | Assemblage de fourche surmoulée | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.01.2008 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP8254219 ; | [X]DE1675125 (DUERKOPPWERKE) [X] 1,4-22 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]US3662569 (WILLIAMS RALPH) [A] 1,9,22* column 1, line 45 - line 50 *; | [A]US4681556 (PALMER BERTRAM J [GB]) [A] 1,9,22 * the whole document *; | [X]US5234378 (HELGESEN GARY D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP8254219 A 19961001 (MATSUI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1,9,22 * abstract * |