Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1561580

EP1561580 - A device for continuously supplying ink under constant pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Print-Rite Unicorn Image Products Co. Ltd of Zhuhai
No. 32, Rd. Ping Bei Yi Lu, Nanping Technological Industries Park Zhuhai
Guangdong 519060 / CN
[2007/45]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
Print-Rite Unicorn Image Products Co. Ltd of Zhuhai
No. 32, Rd. Ping Bei Yi Lu, Nanping Technological Industries Park
Zhuhai, Guangdong 519060 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Qingguo, Xiao
No.32 Rd. Ping Bei Yi Lu Nanping Techn. Ind. Park
Zhuhai Guangdong 519060 / CN
02 / Benyou, Jin
No.32 Rd. Ping Bei Yi Lu Nanping Techn. Ind. Park
Zhuhai Guangdong 519060 / CN
 [2005/32]
Representative(s)Neugebauer, Jürgen
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/05]Neugebauer, Jürgen
Patentanwalt Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
Former [2005/32]Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.Phys. , et al
Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date04020395.227.08.2004
[2005/32]
Priority number, dateCN200421529106.02.2004         Original published format: CN 04215291
CN200426763914.06.2004         Original published format: CN 04267639
[2005/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1561580
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1561580
Date:08.03.2006
[2006/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1561580
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2005/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/45]
Former [2005/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Tintenversorgung unter konstantem Druck[2005/32]
English:A device for continuously supplying ink under constant pressure[2005/32]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation en continu en encre sous pression constante[2005/32]
Examination procedure07.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/33]
18.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2007Fee for grant paid
18.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CY07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
EE07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
TR07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
HU08.05.2008
[2010/38]
Former [2010/34]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CY07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
EE07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
HU08.05.2008
Former [2009/35]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CY07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
EE07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2009/22]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
EE07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2009/15]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2009/13]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
FI07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
GR08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2008/48]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
DE08.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2008/42]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
PT07.04.2008
Former [2008/39]AT07.11.2007
BE07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
RO07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
SK07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
Former [2008/35]AT07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
CZ07.11.2007
DK07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
Former [2008/29]AT07.11.2007
CH07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
Former [2008/26]CH07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
SI07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
Former [2008/24]CH07.11.2007
LI07.11.2007
NL07.11.2007
PL07.11.2007
BG07.02.2008
SE07.02.2008
ES18.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0581531  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 3,58-60 * * page 23, line 55 - page 24, line 21 *;
 [A]EP0846561  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 5c *;
 [A]EP0765756  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US6332673  (HIGUMA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 11a *;
 [A]US4571599  (REZANKA IVAN [US]) [A] 1 * figure 9 *