Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1486226

EP1486226 - Device and method of creating aerosolized mist of respiratory drug [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARADIGM CORPORATION
3929 Point Eden Way
Hayward, CA 94545 / US
[2004/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Lloyd, Lester J.
7 Haciendas Road
Orinda, CA 94563 / US
02 / Lloyd, Peter M.
6239 Elderberry Drive
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
03 / Rubsamen, Reid M.
102 El Camino Real
Berkeley, CA 94705 / US
04 / Schuster, Jeffrey A.
5 El Portal Court
Berkeley, CA 94708 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date04020817.527.10.1995
[2004/51]
Priority number, dateUS1994033092928.10.1994         Original published format: US 330929
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1486226
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1486226
Date:09.11.2005
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00, A61M11/00, B65D47/10
[2005/45]
Former International [2004/51]A61M11/00, A61M15/00, B65D47/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/28]
Former [2004/51]CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Aerosolnebel für atmungserleichternde Medizin[2004/51]
English:Device and method of creating aerosolized mist of respiratory drug[2004/51]
French:Appareil et procédé de création d'un brouillard d'aérosol d'un médicament respiratoire[2004/51]
Examination procedure09.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
09.05.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.09.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, ES, IT
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/25]
27.12.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/25]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95938938.8  / EP0788387
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
02.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.06.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200713   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[LX]WO9609846  (ARADIGM CORP [US]) [LX] 1-7 * page 10, line 20 - line 35 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 12 * * page 20, line 27 - line 32 * * page 43, lines 1-6 * * page 44, line 3 - line 23 * * page 48, line 10 *;
 [A]WO9409842  (ROSEN CHARLES A [US]) [A] * figure -; claims 14-25 *;
 [X]EP0358002  (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4926852  (ZOLTAN BART J [US], et al) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]US5172686  (ANTHONY JEAN-MICHEL [BE]) [A] * abstract *;
 [AP]WO9501137  (VOGES INNOVATION PTY LTD [AU], et al) [AP] * abstract *