Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1514685

EP1514685 - Liquid discharge apparatus and inkjet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/11]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210, Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Former [2005/11]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kodama, Kenichi
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 798 Miyanodai Kaiseimachi
Ashigara-Kami-Gun Kanagawa / JP
 [2005/11]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/11]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date04020886.002.09.2004
[2005/11]
Priority number, dateJP2003031854710.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003318547
[2005/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1514685
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1514685
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/045
[2005/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/49]
Former [2005/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitausstossvorrichtung und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung[2005/11]
English:Liquid discharge apparatus and inkjet recording apparatus[2005/11]
French:Appareil d'éjection de liquide et appareil d'impression jet d'encre[2005/11]
Examination procedure21.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
12.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2006Fee for grant paid
07.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.10.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005PL   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0811490  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,11 * page 17, line 38 - line 42 * * page 19, line 36 - line 39 *;
 [X]JPH1110878  (CANON KK) [X] 1,11 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]JPS57148660  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,11 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]JPH0230539  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,11 * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]JPS55113578  (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,11 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2002097300  (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0276] *
by applicantJPH1110878
 JPH0691893