Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1530173

EP1530173 - Gaming device having a secondary display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2008
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IGT
9295 Prototype Drive
Reno, Nevada 89521-8986 / US
[2007/25]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
IGT
9295 Prototype Drive
Reno, Nevada 89521-8986 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rosander, Tai
4165 Snowshoe Lane
Reno, NV 90502 / US
02 / Mead, Randall D.
1850 Joy Lake Road
Reno, NV 89511 / US
03 / Rothkranz, Markus
3619 Seneca Lane
Las Vegas, NV 89109 / US
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/19]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date04020898.502.09.2004
[2005/19]
Priority number, dateUS2003066168511.09.2003         Original published format: US 661685
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1530173
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1530173
Date:16.11.2005
[2005/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1530173
Date:20.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2005/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/19]
TitleGerman:Spielgerät mit zweitem Anzeigefeld[2005/19]
English:Gaming device having a secondary display[2005/19]
French:Machine de jeu à afficheur secondaire[2005/19]
Examination procedure02.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
01.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2007Fee for grant paid
30.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CY20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
EE20.06.2007
FI20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
TR20.06.2007
LU02.09.2007
IE03.09.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
HU21.12.2007
FR22.02.2008
[2009/44]
Former [2009/40]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CY20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
EE20.06.2007
FI20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
LU02.09.2007
IE03.09.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
FR22.02.2008
Former [2009/35]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CY20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
EE20.06.2007
FI20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
IE03.09.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
FR22.02.2008
Former [2009/11]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
EE20.06.2007
FI20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
IE03.09.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
FR22.02.2008
Former [2008/45]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
IE03.09.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
FR22.02.2008
Former [2008/32]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
FR22.02.2008
Former [2008/28]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
RO20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
Former [2008/23]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
DE21.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
Former [2008/22]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
DK20.06.2007
IT20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
GR21.09.2007
MC30.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
Former [2008/14]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SK20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
Former [2008/11]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
CZ20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
PT20.11.2007
Former [2008/09]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
NL20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
BG20.09.2007
SE20.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
Former [2008/08]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SE20.09.2007
ES01.10.2007
Former [2008/07]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SI20.06.2007
SE20.09.2007
Former [2008/04]AT20.06.2007
BE20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SE20.09.2007
Former [2007/50]AT20.06.2007
CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
PL20.06.2007
SE20.09.2007
Former [2007/49]CH20.06.2007
LI20.06.2007
SE20.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO2004025588  (IGT) [PX] 1-42 * figures 1-9 *;
 [X]DE3804862  (NSM-APPARATEBAU GMBH & CO KG, 6530 BINGEN, DE; NSM AG, 6530 BINGEN, DE) [X] 1-13 * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 65 *;
 [X]DE4402800  (NSM AG, 55411 BINGEN, DE) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 11 *;
 [X]DE3811301  (NSM-APPARATEBAU GMBH & CO KG, 6530 BINGEN, DE; NSM AG, 55411 BINGEN, D) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 25 - column 7, line 65; figures 1,3,4,6 *;
 [A]JPH10328399  ;
 [A]JPH08160893  ;
 [A]JPH08215404  ;
 [A]GB371199  (JOSEPH FOSTER) [A] 1-42 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 57 *;
 [A]US6260296  (CARNEY JR EDGAR F [US]) [A] 1-42 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]GB762611  (ROTORSELLERS LIMITED) [A] 1-42 * figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10328399 A 19981215 (ARUTORON:KK) [A] 1-42 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08160893 A 19960621 (J T:KK) [A] 1-42 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08215404 A 19960827 (TOOPURA:KK) [A] 1 * abstract *