Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1647193

EP1647193 - Apparatus and method for filling a casing with pasty material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Albert Handtmann Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG
Hubertus-Liebrecht-Strasse 10-12
88400 Biberach / DE
[2006/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Schrader, Wolfgang
Dittmarstr.6
88400 Biberach / DE
02 / Miller, Lothar
Am Bläsistock 8
88483 Burgrieden-Rot / DE
03 / Herzig, Volker
Steinachweg 2
88525 Dürmentigen / DE
 [2006/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/16]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04024662.115.10.2004
[2006/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1647193
Date:19.04.2006
Language:DE
[2006/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1647193
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:A22C11/02
[2006/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2006/52]
Former [2006/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Befüllen einer Hülle mit pastösem Füllgut[2006/16]
English:Apparatus and method for filling a casing with pasty material[2006/16]
French:Appareil et procédé de remplissage d'un boyau avec un produit pâteux[2006/16]
Examination procedure01.07.2005Examination requested  [2006/16]
05.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.02.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.11.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE10015893  (HANDTMANN ALBERT MASCHF [DE]) [YD] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0020] - [0038] - [0067] *;
 [Y]DE19706076  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 34 *;
 [A]EP1074180  (TIPPER TIE TECHNOPACK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0024] *;
 [A]DE3600818  (SCHNELL MASCHFAB KARL [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - column 9, line 23 *;
 [A]US2003224712  (HERGOTT STEVEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0031] *
by applicantDE10015893