Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1650375

EP1650375 - A set of floor panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/17]Mechanical locking system for floor panels
[2007/40]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Välinge Innovation AB
Apelvägen 2
260 40 Viken / SE
[2006/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Pervan, Darko
Kyrkogränden 1
26040 Viken / SE
02 / Hakansson, Niclas
Hälsovägen 41 A
25442 Helsinborg / SE
03 / Nygren, Per
S. Brunnsvägen 62
25654 Ramlösa / SE
 [2006/17]
Representative(s)Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake , et al
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/20]Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake , et al
Awapatent AB Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2007/15]Bokinge, Ole , et al
Awapatent AB Platensgatan 9 C
582 20 Linköping / SE
Former [2006/23]Jörgensson, Leif Sixten , et al
Awapatent AB Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Former [2006/17]Rostovanyi, Peter
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date04025167.022.10.2004
[2006/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1650375
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1650375
Date:27.09.2006
[2006/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1650375
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1650375
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02, F16B5/00, E05C19/06
[2006/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/17]
TitleGerman:Satz von Fussbodenpaneelen[2007/40]
English:A set of floor panels[2007/40]
French:Jeu de panneaux de plancher[2007/40]
Former [2006/17]Mechanisches Verriegelungssystem für Fussbodenbretter
Former [2006/17]Mechanical locking system for floor panels
Former [2006/17]Système de blocage mécanique pour planches de plancher
Examination procedure01.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/33]
27.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2007Fee for grant paid
02.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07150233.0  / EP1936068
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.09.2008  21.04.2010  WITHDRAWN
Spanolux SA
Zoning Industriel de Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2010/21]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.2008  21.04.2010  WITHDRAWN
Spanolux SA
Zoning Industriel de Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [2009/30]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.2008  06.10.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Spanolux SA
Zoning Industriel de Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [2008/45]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.2008   
Spanolux SA
Zoning Industriel de Burtonville
6690 Vielsalm / BE
Opponent's representative
Metman, Karel Johannes
de Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
NL-1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
31.10.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.03.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2009Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2009Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.04.2010Date of oral proceedings
07.05.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.05.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.05.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.08.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.11.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO03083234  (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [DX] 1-13,16 * page 25, line 10 - line 15 * * page 35, line 11 - line 16 * * page 40, line 17 - page 41, line 13 * * figures 18,35a-35e *;
 [A]DE20205774U  (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY]) [A] 1 * page 22, line 28 - page 23, line 2 * * page 27, line 1 - page 28, line 4 * * figure 12 *;
 [A]WO03016654  (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 16 - page 19, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [A]WO0102669  (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 10 *;
 [A]GB240629  (VALTER KONSTANTIN HULTIN) [A] * page 1, line 34 - line 86 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB1171337  (TRANSITORIA TRADING COMPANY AB [SE]) [A] * page 2, line 20 - line 116 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US1194636  (JOY R) [A] * page 1, line 38 - line 105 * * figure 1 *