Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1538788

EP1538788 - Smart scan for Bluetooth PAN devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2005/23]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hernandez-Mondragon, Edwin A.
Col. Elvel No. 2212 Pasaje Miramontes
Tegucigalpa / HN
02 / Archer, John W.
5424 206th Street SW
Lynnwood, Washington 98036 / US
03 / Green, Lambert H.
4850 156th Avenue NE, No.9
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
04 / Poursabahian, Siamak
24311 NE 80th Street
Redmond, Washington 98053 / US
05 / Bhanu, Vivek
4621 148th Avenue NE No.OO-101
Bellevue, Washington 98007 / US
 [2005/23]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2005/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04025582.027.10.2004
[2005/23]
Priority number, dateUS2003072484301.12.2003         Original published format: US 724843
[2005/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1538788
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1538788
Date:16.06.2010
[2010/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1538788
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/00, // H04M1/72, H04W48/16, H04W76/02, H04W84/10, H04W84/18
[2016/42]
Former International [2005/23]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2005/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Intelligentes Scannen für Bluetooth PAN Geräte[2005/23]
English:Smart scan for Bluetooth PAN devices[2005/23]
French:Balayages intelligents pour des appareils Bluetooth PAN[2005/23]
Examination procedure17.11.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
21.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2017Fee for grant paid
01.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2010
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
05.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
10.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.10.2004
AT15.03.2017
CY15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU27.10.2004
AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/45]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/35]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
LU27.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/30]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/42]FI15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[IA]  - "IEEE Standard for Information TechnologyTelecommunications and Information Exchange;IEEE Std 802.15.1-2002 ED - Anonymous", IEEE STANDARD; [IEEE STANDARD], IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20020101), ISBN 978-0-7381-3068-2, page _1, XP017603536 [I] 1-4,7,8,11-15,18-21 * page 82, paragraph 8.10.4 * * page 84, paragraph 8.10.6.1 - page 85, paragraph 8.10.6.3 * * page 91, paragraph 8.10.7 - page 93 * * page 278, paragraph 11.2.5.3 * [A] 5,6,9,10,16,17
 [A]  - COMPUTERS, (20010222), XP040422595 [A] 1-21 * page 93, paragraph 8.3 - paragraph 8.5 *