EP1531656 - Ultra-thin copper foil with carrier and printed wiring board using ultra-thin copper foil with carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2009/18] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states FURUKAWA CIRCUIT FOIL CO., LTD. 8-9, Kandanishiki-cho 1 chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Akitoshi Furukawa Circuit Foil Co., Ltd. 601-2, Otorozawa Imaichi-city, Tochigi-ken 321-2336 / JP | 02 /
Fukuda, Shin Furukawa Circuit Foil Co., Ltd. 601-2, Otorozawa Imaichi-city, Tochigi-ken 321-2336 / JP | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/20] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake Partners Rosenheimerstrasse 30, 502 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026739.5 | 10.11.2004 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | JP20030381399 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003381399 | JP20040070806 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004070806 | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1531656 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1531656 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/02, C25D1/04 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
C25D7/0614 (EP,US);
H05K1/09 (KR);
C25D1/04 (EP,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
H05K3/025 (EP,US);
H05K3/38 (KR);
H05K3/383 (EP,US);
H05K3/384 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12028 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12438 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12472 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12514 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12569 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [2008/24] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultradünne Kupferfolie mit Träger und Leiterplatte unter Verwendung einer ultradünnen Kupferfolie mit Träger | [2005/20] | English: | Ultra-thin copper foil with carrier and printed wiring board using ultra-thin copper foil with carrier | [2005/20] | French: | Feuille de cuivre ultra-mince avec support et panneau à circuit imprimé utilisant une feuille de cuivre ultra-mince avec support | [2005/20] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.09.2014 | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/48] | 20.07.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 30.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP33132772B (FURUKAWA CIRCUIT FOIL KK) [DA] 1-6,8-11; | [A]US5114543 (KAJIWARA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5834140 (WOLSKI ADAM M [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-11 * column 5, lines 30-41; example - *; | [A]US5863410 (YATES CHARLES B [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-11 * column 9, lines 25-46; figures 3C,D *; | [DA]JP2000269637 (FURUKAWA CIRCUIT FOIL KK) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6270889 (KATAOKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 5, lines 15-34; claim - *; | [A]EP1133220 (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]JP2002060981 (NIPPON PEROXIDE CO LTD) [A] 4,6,10,12* abstract *; | [A]US2003012975 (GALES RAYMOND [LU], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]JP2003524078 (CIRCUIT FOIL LUXEMBOURG TRADING SA) [DA] 1-11 |