EP1541541 - Process for the preparation of pure alkaline earth alkoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauleder, Hartwig, Dr. Uhlandweg 51a 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
Standke, Burkhard, Dr. Chrischonastrasse 25 79540 Lörrach / DE | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 04027035.7 | 13.11.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | DE20031058411 | 13.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10358411 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541541 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541541 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/70, C07C31/30 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07C29/705 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/705, C07C31/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung alkoxyreiner Erdalkalialkoxide | [2005/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of pure alkaline earth alkoxides | [2005/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d' alcoolates alkalino-terreux purs | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 05.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.12.2006 | CZ | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | EE | 27.12.2006 | IE | 27.12.2006 | PL | 27.12.2006 | RO | 27.12.2006 | SI | 27.12.2006 | SK | 27.12.2006 | TR | 27.12.2006 | BG | 27.03.2007 | SE | 27.03.2007 | GR | 28.03.2007 | ES | 07.04.2007 | IS | 27.04.2007 | HU | 28.06.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 27.12.2006 | |
CZ | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
EE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
SI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 27.12.2006 | |
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
EE | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
SI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 27.12.2006 | |
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
SI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 27.12.2006 | |
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
IE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
SI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 27.12.2006 | |
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
SI | 27.12.2006 | ||
SK | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 27.12.2006 | |
PL | 27.12.2006 | ||
RO | 27.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | ||
ES | 07.04.2007 | ||
IS | 27.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | PL | 27.12.2006 | |
BG | 27.03.2007 | ||
SE | 27.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB667708 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB767601 (HARDMAN & HOLDEN LTD, et al) [A] 1,2* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0026547 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 * |