Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1560102

EP1560102 - Touchscreen with spring-controlled haptic feedback [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
[2012/28]
Former [2005/31]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Prados, Michael
525 Anita Lane
94030 Millbrae / US
 [2005/31]
Application number, filing date04027956.425.11.2004
[2005/31]
Priority number, dateUS20040541411P02.02.2004         Original published format: US 541411 P
[2005/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1560102
Date:03.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1560102
Date:21.02.2007
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033
[2005/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/31]
TitleGerman:Berührungsempfindlicher Bildschirm mit haptischer Rückkopplung die mittels Federn gesteuert wird[2005/31]
English:Touchscreen with spring-controlled haptic feedback[2005/31]
French:Ecran tactile avec rétro-action haptique guidée par des ressorts[2005/31]
Examination procedure21.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/40]
13.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/47]
05.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002033795  (SHAHOIAN ERIK J [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] , [0055] - [0058] - [0072] , [0076] , [0113] , [0114] , [0145] - [0150] - [0183] - [0189] *;
 [X]US6118435  (FUJITA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 1-18 * * column 12, lines 6-31 *;
 [A]WO0133103  (BAR LEV NOAM [IL]) [A] 1-23 * page 9, line 34 - page 11, line 26 *;
 [A]WO9966763  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 - page 3, line 19 *;
 [A]EP0836362  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 46; figures 6,13,17,20 *