Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1544157

EP1544157 - Filling machine for filling containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KHS AG
Juchostrasse 20
44143 Dortmund / DE
[2006/17]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
KHS Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung, Juchostrasse 20
44143 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Clüsserath, Ludwig
Nikolaus-Lenau-Strasse 3
55543 Bad Kreuznach / DE
02 / Härtel, Manfred
Am Schlossgarten 19
55559 Bretzenheim / DE
03 / Krulitsch, Dieter-Rudolf
Stromberger Strasse 22b
55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE
 [2005/25]
Application number, filing date04029312.810.12.2004
[2005/25]
Priority number, dateDE200315931217.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10359312
[2005/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1544157
Date:22.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1544157
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:B67C3/10, B67C3/26
[2005/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SI [2006/11]
Former [2005/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Füllmaschine zum Füllen von Behältern[2005/25]
English:Filling machine for filling containers[2005/25]
French:Machine de remplissage pour remplir des récipients[2005/25]
Examination procedure14.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/36]
23.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2008Fee for grant paid
17.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0337913  (PERRIER IBERICA [ES]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 55; figure . *;
 [A]US4589453  (WEISS WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 53; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE19807892  (KRONSEDER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4270585  (METTE MANFRED)