Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1516931

EP1516931 - DSRNA-mediated regulation of gene expression in plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2019/46]
Former [2005/12]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Heifetz, Peter Bernard
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
02 / Patton, David Andrew
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
03 / Levin, Joshua
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
04 / Que, Qiudeng
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
05 / De Framond, Annick Jeanne
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
06 / Dunn, Martha M.
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
07 / Chen, Jeng Shong
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc.
3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
 [2011/41]
Former [2005/12]01 / Heifetz, Peter Bernard
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
02 / Patton, David Andrew
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
03 / Levin, Joshua
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
04 / Que, Qiudeng
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
05 / De Framond, Annick Jeanne
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
06 / Dunn, Martha M.
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
07 / Chen, Jeng Shong
Syngenta Biotechnology Inc., 3054 Cornwallis Road
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
CHBS-B4.8
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2013/46]Gaal, Jozsef Christopher , et al
Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department PO Box No 3538 Jealott's Hill International, Research Centre Bracknell
Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
Former [2012/41]Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov , et al
Syngenta International AG
Intellectual Property
WRO-1004-6-22
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2011/41]Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov
Syngenta International AG WRO-1004.8.15 Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2011/31]Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov
Syngenta International AG WRO-1004.8.15 Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2011/30](deleted)
...
Former [2006/23]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2005/12]Elliott, Kathryn (GB) , et al
Intellectual Property Department Syngenta Limited Jealott's Hill International Research Station PO Box No 3538
GB-Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
Application number, filing date04030122.825.05.1999
[2005/12]
Priority number, dateUS1998008494226.05.1998         Original published format: US 84942
[2005/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1516931
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1516931
Date:31.10.2007
[2007/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1516931
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63, C12N15/82, A01H5/00
[2005/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2005/12]
TitleGerman:DSRNA-bedingte Regulation der Gen-expression in Pflanzen[2005/12]
English:DSRNA-mediated regulation of gene expression in plants[2005/12]
French:Régulation assurée par l'ARN double- brins de l'expression génétique dans les plantes[2005/12]
Examination procedure31.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
24.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
07.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.04.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2011Fee for grant paid
03.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99926414.6  / EP1080208
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990926414) is  26.11.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012  16.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2016/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association
BASF SE
ZRX-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012  16.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2016/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
BASF IP Association
BASF SE
ZRX-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 02  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patzelt, Andrea
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012  16.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2012/37]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012   
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Jones, Jennifer
Bird & Bird LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1JP / GB
 02  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patzelt, Andrea
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012  31.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012   
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012   
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
 02  12.07.2012   
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patzelt, Andrea
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012   
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 04  12.07.2012   
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2012/33]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2012   
Pajaro Limited
90 Fetter Lane London
EC4A 1EQ / GB
 02  12.07.2012   
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patzelt, Andrea
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 03  12.07.2012   
Bayer CropScience NV
J.E. Mommaertslaan 14
1831 Diegem / BE
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
30.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition19.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0596/15
29.10.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/44]
04.12.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/49]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.10.2009Request for further processing filed
19.10.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
GB25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
IT25.05.2018
ES26.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
DK31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
NL01.06.2018
DE01.12.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/26]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
GB25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
IT25.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
DK31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
NL01.06.2018
DE01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
GB25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
IT25.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
NL01.06.2018
DE01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
GB25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
IT25.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
NL01.06.2018
DE01.12.2018
Former [2019/20]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
NL01.06.2018
Former [2019/19]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
IE25.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/10]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
AT25.05.2018
Former [2014/27]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
LU25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
Former [2013/28]CY25.05.2012
FI25.05.2012
SE26.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR04.12.2012
PT27.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[DXY]EP0458367  (CALGENE INC [US]) [DX] 1,6,9,11,12,14,15,24-27 * page 5, line 50 - page 7, line 1 * * claim - * [Y] 1-10,20-22,24-27;
 [A]WO9417176  (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 20-22 * page 8, line 30 - page 10, line 30 * * example - *;
 [E]WO9932619  (CARNEGIE INST OF WASHINGTON [US], et al) [E] 1,6,17,18,24-27 * page 3, line 17 - page 7 * * claim - * * page 11, line 6 - page 13 * * page 17, line 9 - page 18, line 10 *;
 [E]WO9949029  (GENE AUSTRALIA LIMITED AG [AU], et al) [E] 1-15,24-27 * page 15, line 13 - page 20 * * page 49, line 27 - page 50, line 8; figures 24,25 * * page 60, line 25 - page 61, line 9; figures 53,54 * * page 68 - page 70; example 8 * * page 72 *
 [Y]  - FIRE A ET AL, "Potent and specific genetic interference by double-stranded RNA in Caenorhabditis elegans", NATURE, (19980219), vol. 391, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 806 - 811, XP002095876 [Y] 1-10,24-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35888
 [Y]  - DALE ET AL, "Intra- and intermolecular site-specific recombination in plant cells mediated by bacteriophage P1 recombinase", GENE, (1990), vol. 91, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 79 - 85, XP002094597 [Y] 20-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(90)90165-N
 [A]  - WASSENEGGER, M. & PÉLISSIER, T., "A model for RNA-mediated gene silencing in higher plants", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY., (199805), vol. 37, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 349 - 362, XP002114471 [A] 1-19 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005946720438
 [A]  - MATZKE M A ET AL, "HOW AND WHY DO PLANTS INACTIVATE HOMOLOGOUS (TRANS)GENES?", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (19950301), vol. 107, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 679 - 685, XP002021174
 [A]  - STAM ET AL, "Post-transcriptional silencing of chalcone synthase in Petunia by inverted transgene repeats", PLANT JOURNAL, (199707), vol. 12, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 63 - 82, XP002075455
 [PX]  - WATERHOUSE, P. ET AL., "Virus resistance and gene silencing in plants can be induced by simultaneous expression of sense and antisense RNA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., (199811), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13959 - 13964, XP002114472 [PX] 1,3,4,6-11,14,15,24-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.23.13959
by applicantEP0458367
 WO9932619
 WO9949029
 US5107065
 US5283184
 US5034323
 US5689044
 EP0452269
 US5625136
 US5451513
 US5545817
 US5545818
 WO9516783
 US5767378
 US4940935
 US5188642
 US5639949
 EP0392225
 EP0332104
 EP0342926
 WO9307278
 US5629183
 WO9732011
    - FIRE, A. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 806 - 811
    - WASSENEGGER, M., PELISSIER, T., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 349 - 362
    - STANFORD ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1989), vol. 215, pages 200 - 208
    - XU ET AL., PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 573 - 588
    - LOGEMANN, PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 151 - 158
    - ROHRMEIER, LEHLE, PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 783 - 792
    - FIREK ET AL., PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 129 - 142
    - WAMER ET AL., PLANT J., (1993), vol. 3, pages 191 - 201
    - HUDSPETH, GRULA, PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1989), vol. 12, pages 579 - 589
    - DE FRAMOND, FEBS, (1991), vol. 290, pages 103 - 106
    - PERLAK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 3324
    - KOZIEL ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL., (1993), vol. T 1, page 194
    - MCBRIDE ET AL., PROC. NATT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305
    - SVAB, Z., MAJDUKIEWICZ, P., MALIGA, P., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8526 - 8530
    - STAUB, J. M., MALIGA, P., PLANT CELL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 39 - 45
    - STAUB, J.M., MALIGA, P., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 601 - 606
    - SVAB, Z., MALIGA, P., PROC. NATI. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917
    - GOLDSCHMIDT-CLERMONT, M., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 4083 - 4089
    - MESSING, VIERRA, GENE, (1982), vol. 19, pages 259 - 268
    - BEVAN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 304, pages 184 - 187
    - WHITE, NUCT. ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, page 1062
    - SPENCER ET AL., THEOR. APPL. GENET, (1990), vol. 79, pages 625 - 631
    - BLOCHINGER, DIGGELMANN, MOL CELL BIOL, vol. 4, pages 2929 - 2931
    - MILES, GUEST, GENE, (1984), vol. 32, pages 41 - 48
    - BOUROUIS ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, no. 7, pages 1099 - 1104
    - VELTEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 2730
    - LAWTON ET AL., PLANT J., vol. 10, pages 71 - 82
    - OPPENHEIMER ET AL., CALL, (1991), vol. 67, pages 483 - 493
    - GUYER ET AL., GENETICS, (1998), vol. 149, pages 633 - 639
    - VELTEN ET AL., EMBO JOUMAL, (1984), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 2730
    - UKNES ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1993), vol. 5, pages 159 - 169
    - RAVANEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI, USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 7805 - 7812
    - RAVANEL ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 29, pages 875 - 882
    - MINET ET AL., PLANT J., (1992), vol. 2, pages 417 - 422
    - LAZO ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 963 - 967
    - BECHTOLD ET AL., C. R. ACAD. SCI. PARIS, (1993), vol. 316, pages 1188 - 1193
    - GUYER ET AL., GENETICS, (1998), vol. 149, pages 633 - 649
    - D'HALLUIN ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1992), vol. 216, pages 415 - 426
    - AN ET AL., PLANT J., (1996), vol. 10, pages 107 - 121
    - NORRIS ET AL., PMB, (1993), vol. 21, pages 895 - 906
    - LAWTON ET AL., PLANT J., (1996), vol. 10, pages 71 - 82
    - OW, MEDBERRY, CDTICAL REVIEWS IN PLANT SCIENCES, (1995), vol. 14, pages 239 - 261
    - GALLIE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 8693 - 8711
    - SKUZESKI, PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1990), vol. 15, pages 65 - 79
    - MCELROY ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 163 - 171
    - MCELROY ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET, (1991), vol. 231, pages 150 - 160
    - MCELROY ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 231, pages 150 - 160
    - CHIBBAR ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1993), vol. 12, pages 506 - 509
    - BINET ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 79, pages 87 - 94
    - CHRISTENSEN, PLANT MOLEC. BIOL., (1989), vol. 12, pages 619 - 632
    - TAYLOR ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1993), vol. 12, pages 491 - 495
    - LOGEMANN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 151 - 158
    - ROHRMEIER, LEHLE, PLANT MOLEç. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 783 - 792
    - FIREK ET AL., PLANT MOLEE. BIOL., (1993), vol. 22, pages 129 - 142
    - HUDSPETH, GRULA, PLANT MOLEC BIOL, (1989), vol. 12, pages 579 - 589
    - WHITE ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (1990), vol. 18, page 1062
    - SPENCER ET AL., THEOR APPL GENET, (1990), vol. 79, pages 625 - 631
    - BLOCHINGER, DIGGELMANN, MOI CELL BIOL, vol. 4, pages 2929 - 2931
    - SCHMIDHAUSER, HELINSKI, J BACTERIOL., (1985), vol. 164, pages 446 - 455
    - MCBRIDE ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 14, pages 266 - 276
    - ROTHSTEIN ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 53, pages 153 - 161
    - GRITZ, GENE, (1983), vol. 25, pages 179 - 188
    - THOMPSON ET AL., EMBO J, (1987), vol. 6, pages 2519 - 2523
    - SVAB, Z., MALIGA, P., PNAS, (1993), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917
    - SVAB, Z., HAJDUKIEWICZ, P., MALIGA, P., PNAS, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8526 - 8530
    - METTLER, I. J., PLANT MOL BIOL REPORTER, (1987), vol. 5, pages 346 - 349
    - MCBRIDE, K. E. ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305