Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1547784

EP1547784 - Liquid container, liquid supplying system, manufacturing method therefor, circuit board therefor and liquid containing cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2018/03]
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayasaki, Kimiyuki@Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Haruyuki@Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Watanabe, Kenjiro@Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Hatasa, Nobuyuki@Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Takenouchi, Masanori@Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2018/03]
Former [2005/26]01 / Hayasaki, Kimiyuki Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Haruyuki Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Watanabe, Kenjiro Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Hatasa, Nobuyuki Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Takenouchi, Masanori Canon K.K.
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2018/03]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/26]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04030458.622.12.2004
[2005/26]
Priority number, dateJP2003043594226.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003435942
JP2004031975102.11.2004         Original published format: JP 2004319751
[2005/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1547784
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1547784
Date:22.10.2008
[2008/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1547784
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1547784
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/03]
Former [2005/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsbehälter, Flüssigkeitsversorgungssystem, Herstellungsverfahren dafür, Leiterplatte dafür und Flüssigkeitspatrone[2005/26]
English:Liquid container, liquid supplying system, manufacturing method therefor, circuit board therefor and liquid containing cartridge[2005/26]
French:Réservoir de liquide, système d'alimentation de liquide, sa méthode de fabrication, sa carte de circuit et cartouche contenant du liquide[2005/26]
Examination procedure22.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/26]
16.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2010Fee for grant paid
15.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10195661.3  / EP2319693
EP11150832.1  / EP2319694
EP11154693.3  / EP2322351
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.11.2011  01.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Haldenstrasse 28
8620 Wetzikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Zech, Stefan Markus, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2011  01.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Haldenstrasse 28
8620 Wetzikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Zech, Stefan Markus, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Former [2013/18]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2011  01.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Haldenstrasse 30
8620 Wetzikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Zech, Stefan Markus, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Former [2011/52]
Opponent(s)01  23.11.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Haldenstrasse 30
8620 Wetzikon / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
03.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.05.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.08.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.12.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.08.2013Appeal received No.  T1811/13
11.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
09.09.2013Appeal received No.  T1811/13
08.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
08.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.12.2009Request for further processing filed
11.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HU23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
GB22.12.2011
IE22.12.2011
LU22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
[2018/17]
Former [2013/45]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HU23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
GB22.12.2011
IE22.12.2011
LU22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/44]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
GB22.12.2011
IE22.12.2011
LU22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/33]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
GB22.12.2011
IE22.12.2011
LU22.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2012/10]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/51]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/47]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/39]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/37]BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[AX]EP1114726  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11,18,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0083] * * figures 2-5 * [X] 13;
 [A]GB2317589  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2,9,11,13,18,20 * abstract * * page 8, line 24 - page 14, line 9 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US5616929  (HARA KOHZO [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11,13,18,20 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - column 6, line 16 * * figure - *;
 [A]US6422675  (TOMOMATSU SHIGEMASA [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11,13,18,20 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH0776104
 US6196670
 JPH06155769
 JPH04275156
OppositionEP1270236
 EP0412459
 DE19732628
 WO0043932
 JPH04275156
 EP1352748
 US2002008724
 JP2002301829
    - "EEPROM mit Logik-schaltung", Datasheet Microchip 93LC76/86
    - U. TIETZE, CH. SCHENK, HALBLEITER-SCHALTUNGSTECHNIK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1993), vol. 10, pages 229 - 230, ISBN 3-540-56184-6