blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1547784 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1547784



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2032
21.12.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.12.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.12.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
08.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.12.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
08.12.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 4
08.12.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
30.08.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
30.08.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
30.08.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
25.08.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
06.07.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 33
03.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.12.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
03.11.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
29.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
29.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
29.09.2016 Claims Appeal 5
29.09.2016 Claims Appeal 4
29.09.2016 Claims Appeal 4
29.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
10.06.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
11.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 31
11.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 31
09.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.05.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
04.05.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.05.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
02.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.05.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
02.05.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
26.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.04.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
06.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.04.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.04.2016 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.10.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
02.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
27.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
24.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
16.06.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
16.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
16.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 31
16.06.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
16.06.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 31
11.04.2014 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
01.04.2014 Claims Appeal 4
01.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.04.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.04.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 20
12.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
14.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
07.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
02.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
27.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 6
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 5
27.11.2013 Claims Appeal 6
27.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
27.11.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
21.11.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.11.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
11.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 6
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 5
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 4
11.11.2013 Claims Appeal 6
11.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
08.11.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.11.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.11.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
16.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.08.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
27.08.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.08.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 49
01.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
01.07.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.06.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Claims Opposition 4
08.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
08.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
02.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.05.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
25.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.04.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
27.03.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.03.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.03.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
11.03.2013 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 2
01.02.2013 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
22.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
21.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.05.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
03.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.01.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 38
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
28.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
23.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 38
23.11.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
05.04.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.01.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
09.12.2010 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
09.12.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
15.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.11.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
05.07.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.07.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.07.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.07.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 106
15.01.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
11.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
11.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
11.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
11.12.2009 Description Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.12.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
02.10.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.06.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.02.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.02.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.10.2008 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
23.09.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.09.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
15.04.2008 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.03.2008 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
18.02.2008 General enquiry Search / examination 1
31.08.2005 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
08.07.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.06.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.06.2005 Translation of priority document Search / examination 102
30.06.2005 Translation of priority document Search / examination 126
21.06.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
19.05.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.03.2005 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.02.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
28.02.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
22.12.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 11
22.12.2004 Description Search / examination 74
22.12.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2004 Drawings Search / examination 29
22.12.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6