Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005063493 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014320557 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US201313841007 | 15.03.2013 | US201414325155 | 07.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9090077 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2015 | B2 | US2014240413 | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | US201414267785 | 01.05.2014 | US1691404 | 21.12.2004 | US47306306 | 23.06.2006 | US72142510 | 10.03.2010 | US201213543716 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8801162 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2013208044 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US201313841007 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8764171 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2014 | B2 | US2012293591 | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | US1691404 | 21.12.2004 | US47306306 | 23.06.2006 | US72142510 | 10.03.2010 | US201213543716 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8628179 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2014 | B2 | US2012127247 | 24.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | US201213359458 | 26.01.2012 | US72355107 | 21.03.2007 | US1708404 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8091998 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2012 | B2 | US2011037815 | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US91368110 | 27.10.2010 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | US72355107 | 21.03.2007 | US1708404 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8529034 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2010309266 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US85921810 | 18.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8678570 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2010309265 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7636508 | 18.03.2008 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US85647810 | 13.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8596770 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2013 | B2 | US2010302291 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7636508 | 18.03.2008 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US85567310 | 12.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8678569 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2010208015 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US72543510 | 16.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8376535 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2013 | B2 | US2010165062 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | US1691404 | 21.12.2004 | US47306306 | 23.06.2006 | US72142510 | 10.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7841711 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2010 | B2 | US2009128609 | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | US31870609 | 07.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8382265 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2013 | B2 | US2008204529 | 28.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7636508 | 18.03.2008 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | US1690304 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8136930 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2007195141 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | US72355107 | 21.03.2007 | US1708404 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7717541 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2010 | B2 | US2007052774 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | US1691404 | 21.12.2004 | US47306306 | 23.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7350910 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2008 | B2 | US2006087538 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8454141 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2013 | B2 | US2005219303 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7213914 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2007 | B2 | US2005185034 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7278721 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2007 | B2 | US2005151811 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100851096B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2008 | B1 | KR20060091275 | 18.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100850824B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2008 | B1 | KR20050067054 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100794859B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2008 | B1 | KR20060054097 | 22.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100718612B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2007 | B1 | KR20050067053 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100716083B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2007 | B1 | KR20050067036 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100707321B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2007 | B1 | KR20060032169 | 14.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5442142B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B2 | JP2013067181 | 18.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2013011442 | 24.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5214049B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | B2 | JP2012232602 | 29.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2012197507 | 07.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5111674B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2013 | B2 | JP2012136039 | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2012098204 | 23.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5247875B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B2 | JP2012045955 | 08.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2011266932 | 06.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4942231B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | B2 | JP2011093328 | 12.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2011028831 | 14.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4942228B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2012 | B2 | JP2010162905 | 29.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010102356 | 27.04.2010 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010083150 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2010010498 | 20.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009132157 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2009027896 | 09.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4298786B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2009 | B2 | JP2009040062 | 26.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2008298337 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009040061 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2008298336 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4086888B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2008 | B2 | JP2007230249 | 13.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2007160710 | 18.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4086887B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2008 | B2 | JP2007230248 | 13.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2007160709 | 18.06.2007 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4115480B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | B2 | JP2006142832 | 08.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004308821 | 22.10.2004 | JP2005356831 | 09.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4533125B | Global Dossier | 01.09.2010 | B2 | JP2006142796 | 08.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3793216B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2006 | B2 | JP2006142484 | 08.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004308821 | 22.10.2004 | JP2004330952 | 15.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4058434B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2008 | B2 | JP2006142483 | 08.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4058436B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2008 | B2 | JP2005205893 | 04.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004337556 | 22.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2332727 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2013 | B1 | EP2332727 | 15.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2325014 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B1 | EP2325014 | 25.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | EP04030456 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2325013 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B1 | EP2325013 | 25.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | EP04030456 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2322351 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B1 | EP2322351 | 18.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2319694 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2013 | B1 | EP2319694 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2319693 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B1 | EP2319693 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2272676 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2014 | B1 | EP2272676 | 12.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269827 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | B1 | EP2269827 | 05.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | EP06116584 | 22.12.2004 | EP04030457 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2266802 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2013 | B1 | EP2266802 | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2062731 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B1 | EP2062731 | 27.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1705020 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2012 | B1 | EP1705020 | 29.11.2006 | A3 | EP1705020 | 27.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030457 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1650033 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2009 | B1 | EP1650033 | 26.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1547783 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2011 | B1 | EP1547783 | 29.11.2006 | A3 | EP1547783 | 29.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1547782 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2012 | B1 | EP1547782 | 15.10.2008 | A3 | EP1547782 | 29.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1547781 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | B1 | EP1547781 | 15.10.2008 | A3 | EP1547781 | 29.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005225087B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | B2 | AU2005225087 | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004242557B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | B2 | AU2004242557 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004242555C | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | C1 | AU2004242555B | 25.05.2006 | B2 | AU2004242555 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004242554B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | B2 | AU2004242554 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE444175T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE499212T | 15.03.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE552116T | 15.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0405844 | 17.11.2015 | B1 | BRPI0405844 | 06.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0405848 | 26.01.2016 | B1 | BRPI0405848 | 06.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0405978 | 06.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490732 | 18.12.2012 | C | CA2490732 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490741 | 07.10.2008 | C | CA2490741 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490755 | 13.10.2009 | C | CA2490755 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2524006 | 29.09.2009 | C | CA2524006 | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2635122 | 14.02.2012 | C | CA2635122 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | CA2490741 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2640670 | 18.11.2014 | C | CA2640670 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | CA2490755 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2759022 | 26.08.2014 | C | CA2759022 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | CA2490744 | 21.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100389961C | 28.05.2008 | C | CN1636743 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100389962C | 28.05.2008 | C | CN1636745 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100404268C | 23.07.2008 | C | CN1762712 | 26.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100562432C | 25.11.2009 | C | CN1636741 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101284452B | 03.11.2010 | B | CN101284452 | 15.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101327687B | 07.12.2011 | B | CN101327687 | 24.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101391526B | 13.04.2011 | B | CN101391526 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101468553B | 11.05.2011 | B | CN101468553 | 01.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101683788B | 15.06.2011 | B | CN101683788 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1880090B | 28.12.2011 | B | CN1880090 | 20.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN2810982Y | 30.08.2006 | Y | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN2810983Y | 30.08.2006 | Y | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114459T | 05.10.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP10177371 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1114557T | 05.10.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP11150832 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1115500T | 04.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP10177369 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116402T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112004002498 | 29.03.2018 | C5 | DE112004002498 | 12.04.2012 | B4 | DE112004002498T | 09.11.2006 | T5 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | WO2004JP19786 | 24.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112004003063 | 26.04.2012 | B4 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112004003139 | 14.06.2012 | A5 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112004003140 | 28.06.2012 | A5 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004031498D1 | 07.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005016871D1 | 12.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1547781T | 06.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2266802T | 30.09.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2272676T | 25.08.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2319694T | 28.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2322351T | 08.12.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG24868 | 03.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | WO2004JP19786 | 24.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2360052T | 31.05.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2382004T | 04.06.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2390341T | 12.11.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394745T | 05.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2417054T | 05.08.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2424466T | 02.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2426977T | 28.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2431361T | 26.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2489091T | 01.09.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2539108T | 26.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1072583 | 02.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1073632 | 14.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1073633 | 14.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1086233 | 15.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152277 | 24.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152510 | 02.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152682 | 09.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1153173 | 23.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1154225 | 13.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026616T | 28.06.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL176300 | 28.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | WO2004JP19786 | 24.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LV13525 | 20.08.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04012678 | 01.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04012679 | 30.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04012681 | 01.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO338731B | 10.10.2016 | B1 | NO20063428L | 25.07.2006 | L | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | WO2004JP19786 | 24.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ586205 | 25.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1547781T | 30.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2266802T | 31.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP10177371 | 22.12.2004 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2272676T | 28.11.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | EP10177369 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2319694T | 31.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP11150832 | 22.12.2004 | EP04030458 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1547781E | 06.07.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2266802E | 22.10.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2272676E | 28.07.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2288104 | 27.11.2006 | C2 | RU2004138030 | 10.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2004138031 | 10.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2294286 | 27.02.2007 | C2 | RU2004138032 | 10.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2417934 | 10.05.2011 | C2 | RU2006123278 | 10.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG113033 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG113035 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG113036 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG122001 | 26.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG133612 | 30.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG140594 | 28.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG144154 | 29.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG144155 | 29.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG174073 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1547781T | 31.08.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP04030455 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2266802T | 28.02.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP10177371 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2272676T | 30.10.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP10177369 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2319694T | 31.12.2013 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | EP11150832 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI247687B | 21.01.2006 | B | TW200520978 | 01.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI243099B | 11.11.2005 | B | TW200524738 | 01.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435940 | 26.12.2003 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | JP2004329699 | 12.11.2004 | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI252171B | 01.04.2006 | B | TW200528284 | 01.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI280922B | 11.05.2007 | B | TW200619044 | 16.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004306128 | 20.10.2004 | JP2004371495 | 22.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA87127 | 25.06.2009 | C2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200604448 | 26.03.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | WO2004JP19786 | 24.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7237881 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2007 | B2 | US2005179750 | 18.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100754038B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2007 | B1 | KR20050067050 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4298629B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2009 | B2 | JP2005205886 | 04.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004242556B | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | B2 | AU2004242556 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1547784 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2018 | B2 | EP1547784 | 23.02.2011 | B1 | EP1547784 | 22.10.2008 | A3 | EP1547784 | 29.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE499213T | 15.03.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0405830 | 06.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490744 | 13.12.2011 | C | CA2490744 | 26.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352970B | 24.04.2013 | B | CN101352970 | 28.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101352971B | 05.12.2012 | B | CN101352971 | 28.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1636744 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004031499D1 | 07.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2401962T | 25.04.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2429845T | 18.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2526392T | 12.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152274 | 24.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152275 | 24.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152276 | 24.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04012677 | 16.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2319694E | 31.10.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG113034 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG133611 | 30.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG175591 | 28.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI295631B | 11.04.2008 | B | TW200523121 | 16.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004319751 | 02.11.2004 | JP2003435942 | 26.12.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2319693 | EP2319694 | EP2322351 |