blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1413492

EP1413492 - Pump motor control in electro-hydraulic braking systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
Stratford Road Solihull
B90 4AX / GB
[2006/19]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
46 Park Street London
W1Y 4DJ / GB
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company
46 Park Street
London W1Y 4DJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Harris, Alan Leslie
24 Malvern Road
Balsall Common, Coventry / GB
02 / Kingston, Andrew
Im Kollesump 8
56323 Waldesch / DE
 [2004/24]
Former [2004/18]01 / Harris, Alan Leslie
24 Malvern Road
Balsall Common, Coventry / GB
02 / Kingston, Andrew
Brabenstrasse 31
55262 Heidesheim / DE
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date04075017.623.11.1999
[2004/18]
Priority number, dateGB1998002588727.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9825887
[2004/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1413492
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1413492
Date:12.05.2004
[2004/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1413492
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1413492
Date:14.06.2006
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60T8/40, B60T13/68, B60T17/02, B60T13/14
[2004/18]
CPC:
B60T8/4072 (EP,US); B60T13/686 (EP,US); B60T15/028 (EP,US);
B60T17/02 (EP,US); B60T8/4059 (EP,US); B60T8/4081 (EP,US);
B60T8/4086 (EP,US); F04B49/065 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/18]
TitleGerman:Pumpenmotorregelung in elektrohydraulischen Bremsanlagen[2004/18]
English:Pump motor control in electro-hydraulic braking systems[2004/18]
French:Réglage du moteur de pompe pour systèmes de freinage électro-hydrauliques[2004/18]
Examination procedure13.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
26.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2006Fee for grant paid
27.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99309340.0  / EP1004493
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/43]IT26.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US4402554  (BELART JUAN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 2, line 48 *;
 [A]DE3241039  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1* page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]DE19548248  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - column 3, line 62; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5733017  (NAKASHIMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 46 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.