blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1445721

EP1445721 - Vehicle monitoring and reporting system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 22.04.2015  [2015/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Former [2004/33]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT
Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Maggiore, John B.
1825 N. 51st
Seattle Washington 98103 / US
02 / Frans, William R.
740 NE 56th
Seattle Washington 98105 / US
03 / Sabyasachi, Basu
9702 173rd Ct. NE
Redmond Washington 98052 / US
04 / Iverson, Gene R.E.
P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT
Seattle Washinton 98124-2207 / US
 [2004/33]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2006/26]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2004/33]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date04075212.323.01.2004
[2004/33]
Priority number, dateUS2003036029507.02.2003         Original published format: US 360295
[2004/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1445721
Date:11.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1445721
Date:04.01.2006
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60, G07C5/00
[2004/33]
CPC:
G07C5/006 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/33]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System für die Überwachung und Berichterstellung über Fahrzeuge[2004/33]
English:Vehicle monitoring and reporting system and method[2004/33]
French:Système et procédé de surveillance et de gestion de rapports de véhicules[2004/33]
Examination procedure06.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/14]
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2009Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/17]
20.02.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.11.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/17]
Appeal following examination16.04.2009Appeal received No.  T1000/09
16.04.2009Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
18.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
21.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US6198996  (BERSTIS VIKTORS [US]) [X] 1-25 * column 2, line 49 - line 51 * * column 6, line 43 - line 64 * * column 7, line 29 - line 62 * * column 8, line 27 - line 52 * * column 11, line 37 - line 50 * * figures 1-5,9-11,19-21 *;
 [A]WO0217184  (NEXIQ TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,12,21,24 * page 9, line 15 - page 20, line 29 ** figures 1-4d *;
 [X]US2002065698  (SCHICK LOUIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1,2,10-14 *;
 [PX]US6553290  (PILLAR DUANE R [US]) [PX] 1-25 * column 4, line 47 - line 54 * * column 5, line 36 - line 49 * * column 8, line 1 - line 12 * * column 12, line 7 - line 16 * * column 13, line 47 - line 57 * * figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.