Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1491135

EP1491135 - Method and apparatus for monitoring blood constituents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2010  [2010/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hema Metrics, Inc.
4646 South 1500 West
Riverdale, UT 84405 / US
[2005/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Steuer, Robert R
4157 North 900 West
Pleasant View, UT 84414 / US
02 / Harris, David H
1733 W Clearvue St
Eagle, ID 83616-6787 / US
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Gray, John James
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]Gray, John James
Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square
Glasgow G2 4AD / GB
Application number, filing date04075850.012.04.1993
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1491135
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1491135
Date:07.09.2005
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, G01N21/31
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2005/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen Eigenschaften des Blutes[2005/01]
English:Method and apparatus for monitoring blood constituents[2005/01]
French:Méthode et appareil de mesure de constituants du sang[2005/01]
Examination procedure06.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
01.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/20]
17.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/20]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93910585.4  / EP0693900
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.08.2008Request for further processing filed
01.08.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 12
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 13
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 14
10.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 15
29.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200513   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2005
30.04.200614   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2006
30.04.200715   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2007
30.04.200816   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2008
30.04.200917   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0341059  (SENTINEL MONITORING, INC) [X] 1-9,11,12,17-26,29,30,35-41 * column 5, lines 35-40; figure 1 * * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 41 *;
 [X]US4086915  (KOFSKY ET AL) [X] 1-8,11,12,17-26,29,30,35-41 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 55 *;
 [X]US4167331  (NIELSEN ET AL) [X] 1-8,11,12,17-26,29,30,35-41 * the whole document *