Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1523882 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1269
09.06.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.06.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
26.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.02.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.02.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
07.02.2017 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 5
12.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
02.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.07.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.07.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.07.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.07.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
09.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
03.06.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.05.2015 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.05.2015 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.04.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 26
24.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.04.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.03.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
08.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.07.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
28.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
26.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
23.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
11.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
22.11.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
09.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.10.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
08.06.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.06.2012 Claims Appeal 3
04.06.2012 Claims Appeal 3
04.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
05.04.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.03.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.03.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
23.01.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
23.01.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
23.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
18.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.10.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
17.06.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.12.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
23.12.2010 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
08.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2010 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
20.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2010 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.01.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.01.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.12.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 23
15.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.12.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 23
12.02.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.01.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
21.01.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
07.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 186
02.02.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
16.07.2007 Description Search / examination 2
16.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
16.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.06.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.09.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.05.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.03.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2006 European search report Search / examination 4
20.12.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.12.2005 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
12.04.2005 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
23.03.2005 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
22.03.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.03.2005 Priority document Search / examination 227
09.03.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.12.2004 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 6
30.09.2004 Description Search / examination 139
30.09.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
30.09.2004 Drawings Search / examination 40
30.09.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 7
30.09.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7