Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1531218

EP1531218 - Device for locking a door, and a door and a door assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M.H.B. (Mathijssen Herveld Betuwe) B.V.
Onderstalstraat 3
6674 ME Herveld / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]For all designated states
M.H.B. B.V.
Onderstalstraat 3
6674 ME Herveld / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Mathijssen, Markus Johannes Hendrikus
Onderstalstraat 3
6674 ME Herveld / NL
 [2005/20]
Representative(s)Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date04078091.810.11.2004
[2005/20]
Priority number, dateNL2003102478814.11.2003         Original published format: NL 1024788
[2005/20]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1531218
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1531218
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/10, E06B5/16
[2005/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/20]
TitleGerman:Türverriegelungsvorrichtung, Tür und Türanlage[2005/20]
English:Device for locking a door, and a door and a door assembly[2005/20]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage de porte, porte et assemblage de porte[2005/20]
Examination procedure03.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/01]
22.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2008Fee for grant paid
23.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
IE10.11.2009
LU10.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
IE10.11.2009
LU10.11.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
IE10.11.2009
LU10.11.2009
Former [2010/46]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
IE10.11.2009
Former [2010/09]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[Y]NL1018457C  (DICTATOR PRODUCTIE BV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE9421217U  (ERNST ERICH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8714924U  (GEBR. BETZ GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-3,5,9,10,13-16 * the whole document *