Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1524062

EP1524062 - Application of friction stir welding to superplastically formed structural assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2007Correction of patent specificationpublished on 24.10.2007  [2007/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
Former [2005/16]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 N. Riverside
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Colligan, Kevin James
27980 Kim Drive
Harvest Alabama 35749 / US
 [2005/16]
Representative(s)Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/16]Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date04078575.025.03.2002
[2005/16]
Priority number, dateUS2001081832527.03.2001         Original published format: US 818325
[2005/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1524062
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1524062
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1524062
Date:24.10.2007
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:B23K20/12, B23K20/02, B23K20/18, B21D26/02
[2005/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/16]
TitleGerman:Anwendung des Reibrührschweissens für superplastisch verformte Strukturbaugruppen[2005/16]
English:Application of friction stir welding to superplastically formed structural assemblies[2005/16]
French:Utilisation du soudage par friction à mouvement cyclique aux ensembles structurels formés superplastiquement[2005/16]
Examination procedure30.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/30]
23.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2006Fee for grant paid
04.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02076168.0  / EP1245325
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0117721  (LOCKHEED CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5204161  (PETTIT RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 55 - column 7, line 62 *;
 [A]EP1057574  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]US5881459  (YASUI KEN K [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 20 - column 10, line 32 *;
 [A]EP0972605  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0028]; figure 9A *