blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1457191 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1457191



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 113
31.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.12.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.01.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.12.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.12.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.12.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.12.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.12.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.09.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.08.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.08.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
27.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Description Search / examination 4
27.06.2008 Description Search / examination 4
27.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.02.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
18.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
18.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.08.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 European search report Search / examination 2
04.08.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.07.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Priority document Search / examination 12
25.02.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
25.02.2004 Description Search / examination 9
25.02.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6