blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1457191
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2004180069Global Dossier 16.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1457191Global Dossier 25.02.2009B1
EP1457191 29.09.2004A3
EP1457191 15.09.2004A2
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT423542T 15.03.2009T
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE10312124 12.03.2009B4
DE10312124 23.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE502004009030D 09.04.2009D1
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2322902T 01.07.2009T3
Priority number Date
DE10312124 13.03.2003