Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1457191

EP1457191 - Cosmetic powder based on silicium dioxide and process for preparing it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coty B.V.
Oudeweg 147
2031 CC Haarlem / NL
[2004/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Bleuez, Loïc
201, Avenue des Pugets Res. La Romarine
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
02 / Golz-Berner, Karin
42, quai Jean-Charles Rey
98000 Monaco / MC
03 / Porcu, Maryse
Les Oliviers de Monte Carlo Chemin de la Saint Jean
06240 Beuasoleil / FR
 [2009/06]
Former [2004/40]01 / Bleuez, Lois
148, Blvd de Provence
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
02 / Golz-Berner, Karin
34, quai Jean-Charles Rey
98000 Monaco / MC
03 / Porcu, Maryse
Chemin de la Saint Jean
06240 Beuasoleil / FR
Former [2004/38]01 / Bleuez, Lois
148, Blvd de Provence
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
02 / Golz-Berner, Karin
34, quai Jean-Charles Rey
98000 Monaco / MC
03 / Pocru, Maryse
Chemin de la Saint Jean
06240 Beuasoleil / FR
Representative(s)Ziebig, Marlene , et al
Gulde Hengelhaupt
Ziebig & Schneider
Wallstrasse 58/59
DE-10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Ziebig, Marlene , et al
Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Former [2004/38]Walter, Wolf-Jürgen , et al
Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date04090068.025.02.2004
[2004/38]
Priority number, dateDE200311212413.03.2003         Original published format: DE 10312124
[2004/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1457191
Date:15.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1457191
Date:29.09.2004
[2004/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1457191
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/25, A61Q1/12
[2008/35]
Former International [2004/38]A61K7/02, A61K7/035, A61K7/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Former [2004/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kosmetischer Puder auf Siliciumdioxid-Basis und Herstellungsverfahren[2004/38]
English:Cosmetic powder based on silicium dioxide and process for preparing it[2004/38]
French:Poudre cosmétique à base de dioxyde de silicium et son procédé de préparation[2004/38]
Examination procedure16.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/20]
22.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2008Fee for grant paid
29.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LU25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LU25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/21]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LU25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/50]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/30]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/25]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GB25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/10]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/09]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/47]DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/46]DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO02056844  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 22; example 1; table 1 *;
 [PX]EP1386599  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO0137800  (COLOR ACCESS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *;
 JP2000309505  [ ] (SHISEIDO CO LTD)
 [X]  HASENZAHL, S., BRAUNAGEL, A., "Fumed silica for personal care and cosmetics - versatile and effective", SÖFW JOURNAL SONDERDRUCK, vol. 129, (200308), pages 2 - 8, URL: http://www2.sivento.de/sivento/uploads_all/text/Fumed_silica_for_personal_care_and_cosmetics_-_versatile_and_effective.pdf, (20040721), XP002289365 [X] 1-4,6 * page 7, column L, paragraphs 3,4; table 5 *
 [T]  ""Trockenes Wasser" für die Haut", PRESSE-INFORMATION NR.1, DEGUSSA HOMEPAGE, (20040415), URL: https://www1.sivento.com/wps3/portal/action/PassContent/.reqid/-1?cqpath=http://www2.sivento.de/sivento/uploads_all/text/AquaFoundation_en.pdf, (20040720), XP002289366 [T] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [T]  "AEROSIL präsentiert die neusten Formulierungen auf Basis von "Trockenes Wasser"", DEGUSSA HOMEPAGE, (200405), URL: https://www1.sivento.com/wps3/portal/en/aerosil/more0?cqpath=http://149.216.91.49:4103/en/aerosil/more0&changeLang=de, (20040720), XP002289367 [T] 1-9
 [A]  OKA, TAKASHI ET AL, "Cosmetic powders liquefying on application", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:782691, URL: STN, XP002289379 [A] 1-9 * abstract *
by applicantUS6290941
 EP1386599
    J. AMER.CHEM.SOC., (1938), vol. 60, page 309,