EP1553732 - Method and arrangement for starting a node in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖRING, Martin Gebrüder-Grimm-Strasse 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
HOPPMANN, Michael Glinderhagen 23 38176 Wendeburg / DE | 03 /
ZIMMERMANN, Axel Neuer Weg 4 26446 Friedeburg / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
Döring, Martin Gebrüder-Grimm-Strasse 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
Hoppmann, Michael Glinderhagen 23 38176 Wendeburg / DE | |||
03 /
Zimmermann, Axel Neuer Weg 4 26446 Friedeburg / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2005/28] | Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090437.7 | 16.11.2004 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | DE2003158248 | 09.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10358248 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553732 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1553732 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553732 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/403, H04J3/06, // H04J3/14 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/40026 (EP);
H04L12/4035 (EP);
H04J3/0658 (EP);
H04L2012/40241 (EP);
H04L2012/40273 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/28] | H04L12/403 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Hochfahren eines Knotens eines Kommunikationssystems | [2005/28] | English: | Method and arrangement for starting a node in a communication system | [2005/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de démarrage d'un noeud dans un système de communication | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2004 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | IE | 16.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | FR | 05.12.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | GB | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.11.2004 | |
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 05.12.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 05.10.2016 | |
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | ES | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - STEINER ET AL, "Multiple failure correction in the time-triggered architecture", OBJECT-ORIENTED REAL-TIME DEPENDABLE SYSTEMS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. NINTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON 1-3 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, Anacapri, Italy, (20031001), doi:10.1109/WORDS.2003.1267551, ISBN 978-0-7695-2054-4, pages 347 - 354, XP031099437 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 349, paragraph 2.2 - page 350 * * page 350, paragraph 3.2 - page 353, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WORDS.2003.1267551 | [A] - LONN H ED - GOUDA M G (ED), "INITIAL SYNCHRONIZATION OF TDMA COMMUNICATION IN DISTRIBUTED REAL-TIME SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS. ICDCS '99. AUSTIN, TX, MAY 31 - JUNE 4, 1999; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMPUTER SOC, US, (19990531), doi:10.1109/ICDCS.1999.776539, ISBN 978-0-7803-5706-8, pages 370 - 379, XP000883615 [A] 1-16 * page 370, column l, paragraph l - page 371, column l, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1999.776539 | [A] - STEINER W ET AL, "The transition from asynchronous to synchronous system operation: an approach for distributed fault-tolerant systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS. ICDCS 2002. VIENNA, AUSTRIA, JULY 2 - 5, 2002; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20020702), vol. CONF. 22, ISBN 978-0-7695-1585-4, pages 297 - 304, XP010595544 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 297, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 3 * * page 299, column r, paragraph 3 - page 300, column l, paragraph 3.1 * * page 301, column r, paragraph 4.1 * | Examination | WO0043857 | US6145008 |