blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1426719

EP1426719 - Device, system and method for on-line explosive deslagging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zilka, Francis
1240 Saratoga Road
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
For all designated states
Zilka, Timothy
200 Lake Avenue
Saratoga, NY 12866 / US
[2004/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Zilka, Francis
1240 Saratoga Road
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
02 / Zilka, Timothy
200 Lake Avenue
Saratoga, NY 12866 2 / US
03 / Prouty, Kurt
47 Bay Path
Norwell, MA 02061 / US
04 / Howard, Donald
147 Juniper Drive
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]Metman, Karel Johannes
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date04100097.714.01.1998
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateUS1997078609617.01.1997         Original published format: US 786096
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1426719
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1426719
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:F27D23/02, F27D1/16, B08B7/00, F27D1/12
[2004/24]
CPC:
F28G7/00 (EP,US); B08B7/0007 (EP,US); B08B9/08 (EP,US);
F23J3/02 (EP,US); F27D1/12 (EP,US); F27D1/1694 (EP,US);
F27D25/006 (EP,US); F28G7/005 (EP,US); F42D3/00 (EP,US);
F27D9/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting states[2013/19]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung, System und Verfahren zur on-line explosiven Entschlackung[2004/24]
English:Device, system and method for on-line explosive deslagging[2004/24]
French:Dispositif, système, et procédé de décrassage à explosif en ligne[2004/24]
Examination procedure06.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
11.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/35]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00203711.7  / EP1067349
EP98903494.7  / EP0974035
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980903494) is  02.01.2001
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
28.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2840365  (GERRIT KRUK) [X] 1,14-17,34-36 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]GB823353  (DU PONT) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]LU41977  (P.GOFFART) [X] 1,14-17,34-36 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 4; figures 1-4; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]FR2567426  (MAUREL ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [X]US5494004  (HUNTER JR LOUIS G [US]) [X] 1,14-17,34-36 * column 1, line 30 - column 6, line 55; figures 1-12; claims 1,4, 8, *;
 [X]  - Helmut Heinze, Handbuch Sprengtechnik, Leipzig, VEB Deutscher Verlag für Grundstoffindustrie,, (1980), pages 344 - 351, XP002680365 [X] 1,14-17,34-36 * page 349, column 1, line 12 - page 351; figure 4.15.3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.