blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1489224

EP1489224 - Headbox [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Hutterer, Robert
Mariazellerstrasse 16/21
3100 St. Pölten / AT
 [2004/52]
Application number, filing date04101919.105.05.2004
[2004/52]
Priority number, dateDE200312471130.05.2003         Original published format: DE 10324711
[2004/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489224
Date:22.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2004
ClassificationIPC:D21F1/02
[2004/52]
CPC:
D21F1/06 (EP); D21F1/02 (EP); D21F1/028 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/37]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stoffauflauf[2004/52]
English:Headbox[2004/52]
French:Caisse de tête[2004/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/11]
13.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.07.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005PL   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
29.07.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.07.2005M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3215593  (GREEN MARSHALL S) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 74 - column 4, line 27; figure 4 *;
 [Y]GB1358197  (BELOIT CORP) [Y] 5* page 2, line 35 - page 2, line 50; figures 5,9 *;
 [X]US4551204  (HOLIK HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 5; figure 8 *;
 [X]DE19621258  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 4 * column 2, line 48 - column 2, line 68; figure 4 *;
 [XY]DE19747295  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 41 * * column 5, line 21 - column 5, line 39 * * column 6, line 1 - column 6, line 25; figures 2,4,6,8 * [Y] 5;
 [X]US6251225  (RUF WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 4 * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 6; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.