EP1484028 - Dental turbine support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentalez, INC. 101 H Cherry Lane Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bowen, Stanley A. / 19201 La Loma CA 92705, Santa Ana / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2004/50] | 01 /
Bowen, Stanley A. 19201 La Loma 92705, Santa Ana / US | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [2004/50] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 04102429.0 | 01.06.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | US20030453301 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: US 453301 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484028 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484028 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484028 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/05, A61C1/18 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A61C1/181 (EP,US);
A61C1/05 (EP,US);
F16C25/083 (EP,US);
F16C27/066 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
F16C19/547 (EP,US);
F16C2316/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Abstützanordnung für eine Dentalturbine | [2004/50] | English: | Dental turbine support structure | [2004/50] | French: | Structure de support pour une turbine dentaire | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2004 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | PT | 14.01.2013 | GB | 01.06.2013 | IE | 01.06.2013 | LU | 01.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 01.06.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 01.06.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4249896 (KERFOOT FRANK W JR [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002110781 (NAKANISHI TAKASUKE [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US4249896 |