Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1496324

EP1496324 - Refrigeration appliance with automatic time-determined defrost [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63 Benton Harbor
Michigan 49022 / US
[2013/38]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63
Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ergarac, Dejan
Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l.
V.le G. Borgh
21025, Comerio / IT
 [2013/38]
Former [2005/02]01 / Ergarac, Dejan
Patent Dept. Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. V.le G. Borgh
21025, Comerio / IT
Representative(s)Spina, Alessandro , et al
Whirlpool EMEA SpA
Via Carlo Pisacane, 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Former [2005/02]Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Application number, filing date04103090.930.06.2004
[2005/02]
Priority number, dateIT2003MI0139509.07.2003         Original published format: IT MI20031395
[2005/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1496324
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1496324
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:F25D21/00
[2005/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PL [2005/39]
Former [2005/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlgerät mit automatischer zeitbestimmter Entfrostung[2005/02]
English:Refrigeration appliance with automatic time-determined defrost[2005/02]
French:Appareil frigorifique à dégivrage automatique déterminé par l'heure[2005/02]
Examination procedure28.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
13.07.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.11.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2013Fee for grant paid
01.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2014  18.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arçelik Anonim Sirketi
E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri
Tuzla
34950 Istanbul / TR
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2014  18.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Arçelik Anonim Sirketi
Ankara Asfalti Uzeri E5, Tuzia
34950 Istanbul / TR
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.11.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition10.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0092/17
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.08.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
17.08.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5483804  (OGAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 4-20 * * column 5, lines 4-13 * * column 12, lines 24-33 * * claims 1,3,5 *;
 [PA]WO03098134  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [PA] 1-4 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 20 *;
 [A]EP1225406  (JTL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0044] - [0047] *;
 [A]US5515692  (STERBER FRANK W [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 43-47 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 17 *;
 [A]US3898860  (SHEPHERD GLEN C, et al) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 51-57 *;
 [A]US4327557  (CLARKE CLARENCE C, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 37-40 *