Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1666398

EP1666398 - Method for transporting passengers in a building [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inventio AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/25]For all designated states
Inventio AG
Seestrasse 55 Postfach
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55, Postfach
CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Finschi, Lukas, Dr.
Weystrasse 26
6006 Luzern / CH
02 / Friedli, Paul, Dr.
Lindenweg 2
5453 Remetschwil / CH
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Gaussmann, Andreas , et al
Bogensberger Patent- & Markenbüro
Fallsgasse 7
9492 Eschen / LI
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Gaussmann, Andreas , et al
Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Former [2006/23]Gaussmann, Andreas , et al
c/o Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55, Postfach
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Application number, filing date04106222.501.12.2004
[2006/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1666398
Date:07.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1666398
Date:19.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:B66B1/14, B66B1/18
[2006/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beförderung von Personen in einem Gebäude[2006/23]
English:Method for transporting passengers in a building[2006/23]
French:Méthode pour transporter des personnes dans un bâtiment[2006/23]
Examination procedure07.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
21.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2013Fee for grant paid
08.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.03.2014  21.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Elevator AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
m patent group, et al
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
 [2018/31]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2014   
ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte, et al
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0136/16
24.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2004
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
AT01.12.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
AT01.12.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
Former [2015/25]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
AT01.12.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
Former [2014/48]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE01.12.2013
LU01.12.2013
Former [2014/38]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU01.12.2013
Former [2014/24]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/21]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/18]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/14]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2013/50]LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT19.06.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6065570  (FRIEDLI PAUL [CH], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 7 * [Y] 10;
 [XD]EP1418147  (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [XD] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2313453  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * abstract *
by applicantUS6065570