Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1537953

EP1537953 - Magazining device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2008/43]
Former [2005/23]For:DE  FR  GB 
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Pally, Andreas
Eichenstrasse 15
6015, Reussbühl / CH
02 / Daubinger, Gerd
Eduard-Spranger-Strasse 34
80935, München / DE
 [2005/23]
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2009/38]
Former [2005/23]Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date04106301.706.12.2004
[2005/23]
Priority number, dateDE200315654804.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10356548
[2005/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1537953
Date:08.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1537953
Date:07.06.2006
[2006/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1537953
Date:22.10.2008
Language:DE
[2008/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:B25C1/18
[2005/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2007/07]
Former [2005/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Magaziniervorrichtung[2005/23]
English:Magazining device[2005/23]
French:Dispositif de mise en magasin[2005/23]
Examination procedure07.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
27.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2008Fee for grant paid
03.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE19707235  (HILTI AG [LI]) [DX] 1,7 * column 5, line 6 - line 21; figure 4 * [Y] 5;
 [XY]US2522931  (CURTISS FRANK R) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 59; figures 1,3 * [Y] 5;
 [X]US2003102351  (CHENG CHENG-TSUNG [TW]) [X] 1,3,7 * figures 1,4 * * page 1, paragraph 8; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5829661  (HIRTL ANTON [CH], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 53 - line 56; figures 2-4 * * column 3, line 24 - line 31 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 67 *