Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1541458

EP1541458 - Method for constructing a float [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unidek Group B.V.
Scheiweg 26
5421 XL Gemert / NL
[2005/24]
Inventor(s)01 / van Dijk, Hendrikus Johannes Maria
Unidek Group B.V. Scheiweg 26
5421 XL Gemert / NL
 [2005/24]
Representative(s)Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/24]Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date04106399.108.12.2004
[2005/24]
Priority number, dateNL2003102499812.12.2003         Original published format: NL 1024998
[2005/24]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1541458
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1541458
Date:12.12.2007
[2007/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1541458
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:B63B35/44, B63B3/06, B63B5/16, B63B9/06
[2007/50]
Former International [2005/24]B63B5/16, B63B9/06, B63B35/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Konstruktion eines Schwimmers[2005/24]
English:Method for constructing a float[2005/24]
French:Procédé de construction d'un flotteur[2005/24]
Examination procedure05.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/30]
21.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2008Fee for grant paid
13.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/50]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/09]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/50]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US4548153  (WATCHORN ERNEST W [CA]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4265193  (SLUYS WESLEY W) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 10 - line 63 *;
 [A]US5044296  (FINN ARNOLD A [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB2084520  (BUCHANAN ROBERT ALAN) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0058654