Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1674840

EP1674840 - Filling system in a balance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mettler-Toledo AG
Im Langacher
8606 Greifensee / CH
[2006/36]
Former [2006/26]For all designated states
Mettler-Toledo GmbH
Im Langacher
8606 Greifensee / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Lüchinger, Paul
Guldenenstrasse 49
8610 Uster / CH
 [2006/26]
Application number, filing date04106976.623.12.2004
[2006/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1674840
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1674840
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01G21/28, G01G21/22
[2006/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/26]
TitleGerman:Abfüllsystem in einer Waage[2006/26]
English:Filling system in a balance[2006/26]
French:Système de remplissage dans une balance[2006/26]
Examination procedure07.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
30.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2008Fee for grant paid
24.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
TR04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
Former [2010/50]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/09]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2009/47]DK04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
Former [2009/46]DK04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
Former [2009/40]FI04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
ES15.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL04.02.2009
ES15.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2002038567  (LUCHINGER PAUL [CH]) [AD] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [AD]US2002040815  (LUCHINGER PAUL [CH]) [AD] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [AD]US2002040814  (LUCHINGER PAUL [CH], et al) [AD] 1-25 * abstract *
by applicantUS6557391