Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1441142

EP1441142 - Force transmission device for a disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited
Grange Road Cwmbran
Gwent NP44 3XU / GB
[2008/51]
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited
Grange Road
Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Heinlein, Carl Edward
The Briary Homer Much Wenlock
Shropshire TF13 6NL / GB
 [2008/51]
Former [2005/10]01 / Heinlein, Carl Edward
The Briary Homer Much Wenlock
Shropshire, TF13 6NL / GB
Former [2004/31]01 / Heinlein, Carl Edward
St Davids Chepstow Road
Langstone Newport NP18 2JR / GB
Representative(s)Foot, Paul Matthew James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
Greater London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/02]Foot, Paul Matthew James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2004/31]Jones, John Bryn , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date04250341.722.01.2004
Priority number, dateGB2003000179825.01.2003         Original published format: GB 0301798
[2004/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1441142
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1441142
Date:17.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/18, F16D65/14, F16D65/56
[2004/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/31]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Kraftübertragung für eine Scheibenbremse[2004/31]
English:Force transmission device for a disc brake[2004/31]
French:Dispositif de transmission de force pour un frein à disque[2004/31]
Examination procedure07.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/10]
05.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2008Fee for grant paid
30.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
CY17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
TR17.12.2008
IE22.01.2009
LU22.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
GR18.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
HU18.06.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
IE22.01.2009
LU22.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
GR18.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
HU18.06.2009
Former [2011/21]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
IE22.01.2009
LU22.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
GR18.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2010/50]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
IE22.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
GR18.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2010/07]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
IE22.01.2009
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2009/47]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
CH31.01.2009
LI31.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2009/46]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
DK17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2009/44]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
SK17.12.2008
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT17.12.2008
BE17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
MC31.01.2009
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
PT18.05.2009
Former [2009/36]BE17.12.2008
EE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
RO17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
Former [2009/35]BE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
BG17.03.2009
ES28.03.2009
Former [2009/32]BE17.12.2008
FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
Former [2009/26]FI17.12.2008
NL17.12.2008
SI17.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US6269914  (ANGERFORS DAN) [X] 1,3-6,9-11 * column 3, line 5 - line 43 * * column 4, line 5 - line 7; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0852301  (WABCO PERROT BREMSEN GMBH) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 43; figures 2-4 *;
 [DA]US6435319  (PRATT RALPH ET AL) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *