Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1508378

EP1508378 - Rotating stream sprinkler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rain Bird Corporation
145 N Grand Avenue
Glendora, CA 91741-2469 CA / US
[2005/08]
Inventor(s)01 / De Los Santos, Lino
624 Silver Valley Trail
Walnut, CA 91789 / US
 [2005/08]
Representative(s)Grey, Ian Michael , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/08]Grey, Ian Michael , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date04250970.323.02.2004
[2005/08]
Priority number, dateUS2003064461119.08.2003         Original published format: US 644611
[2005/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1508378
Date:23.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1508378
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B05B3/04, B05B1/30
[2005/08]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/43]
Former [2005/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rotierender Regner[2005/08]
English:Rotating stream sprinkler[2005/08]
French:Arroseur rotatif[2005/08]
Examination procedure19.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
24.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0339966  (MAMTIRIM LTD DAN [IL]) [A] 1,10,28 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4784325  (WALKER SAMUEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,10,28 * column 6, line 55 - column 10, line 59; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US5984205  (ROSENBERG PERETZ [IL]) [A] 1,10,28 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 8; figure 1 *