Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1469410

EP1469410 - Methods for unified billing across independant networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Benenati, David
15 Webster Road
Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US
02 / Feder, Peretz Moshes
300 Starling Road
Englewood, New Jersey 07631 / US
03 / Lee, Nancy Yushan
23 Pilgrim Court
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
04 / Martin-Leon, Silvia
8 Castleton Road, Middleleaze
Swindon SN5 9GD / GB
05 / Shapira, Reuven
103 Saw Mill Drive
Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US
 [2004/43]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2004/43]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date04251868.830.03.2004
[2004/43]
Priority number, dateUS2003041338315.04.2003         Original published format: US 413383
[2004/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1469410
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, H04M15/00, H04L12/14
[2004/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/28]
Former [2004/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur einheitlichen Abrechnung bei unabhängigen Netzwerken[2004/43]
English:Methods for unified billing across independant networks[2004/43]
French:Procédés de facturation unifiée pour réseaux indépendants[2004/43]
Examination procedure13.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/43]
15.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.03.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/17]
Appeal following examination28.10.2005Appeal received No.  T0045/06
28.12.2005Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2010Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0158110  (MCCONNELL RICHARD ; CLARKE SEAMUS (GB); MURPHY DENIS (GB); RODGERS MIC) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, lines 9-15 * * page 6, lines 5-10 * * page 7, lines 12,13 * * page 8, lines 8-10 *;
 [X]WO0064123  (ANGELO LEO D ; JFAX COM INC (US)) [X] 1-10 * page 7, lines 5-16 * * page 9, lines 1,2 * * page 30, lines 20-27 *;
 [A]US5995946  (REDDY RAGHU ET AL) [A] * column 3, lines 6-11 *;
 [A]  - CONVERGY 3G.CO.UK, "Charging gateway function for GPRS networks and enhanced 1xRTT support.", (20020615), URL: http://www.3g.co.uk/PR/June2002/3564.htm, (20040615), XP002284742 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * pages 1-2 *
 [A]  - USHA COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY, "GPRS General Radio Packet Service", (20000626), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://www.mobilein.com/white_papers_and_tutorials.htm, (20040615), XP002284743 [A] 1-10 * pages 8-11 * * pages 14,16,17 * * figure 5; table 1 *