Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1486645

EP1486645 - Cam phaser with vanes on rotor and a locking pin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2005/21]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
BorgWarner Powertrain Technical Center 3800 Automation Avenue, Ste. 100
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1782 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gardner, Marty
80 Orion Drive
Dryden New York 13053 / US
02 / Marsh, Mike
812 Adams Hill Road
Dryden New York 13053 / US
03 / Wigsten, Mark
190 Buck Road
Lansing New York 14882 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date04252856.217.05.2004
[2004/51]
Priority number, dateUS2003045966611.06.2003         Original published format: US 459666
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1486645
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1486645
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/344
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2005/36]
Former [2004/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Nockenwellenverstellanordnung mit Flügel am Rotor und ein Verriegelungsstift[2004/51]
English:Cam phaser with vanes on rotor and a locking pin[2004/51]
French:Déphaseur avec rotor à aubes et un pion de blocage[2004/51]
Examination procedure24.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/29]
21.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2008Fee for grant paid
18.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08075737.0  / EP2006500
Opposition(s)06.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6276321  (LICHTI THOMAS HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5,6,8;
 [XY]US2002043230  (KINUGAWA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figure 9 * [Y] 5,6,8;
 [XDY]US6311655  (SIMPSON ROGER T [US], et al) [XD] 1-4 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 5,6,8;
 [Y]US2003033999  (GARDNER MARTY [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * figure 6 *;
 [Y]EP1286023  (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [Y] 5,6 * figure 6 *;
 [Y]US2001054402  (SIMPSON ROGER T [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figures 2,4,6,8 *