Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1491419

EP1491419 - Three-piece motion control truck system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amsted Rail Company, Inc.
1700 Walnut Street
Granite City, IL 62040 / US
[2011/16]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Amsted Rail Company, Inc.
1700 Walnut Street
Granite City IL 62040 / US
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
ASF-Keystone, Inc.
1700 Walnut street
Granite City, Illinois 62040 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Berg, Thomas
1120 Dunwoody Drive
St. Louis, Missouri 63122 / US
02 / Reese, Nathan
516B Bargraves Blvd.
Troy, Illinois 62294 / US
03 / Schorr, Ralph
3413 Wilderness Drive
Edwardsville, Illinois 62025 / US
04 / Ruback, Jeff
6249 Sworm Lane
Edwardsville, Illinois 62025 / US
05 / Pershwitz, Julius
6 Sand Dollar Road
Grantham, Pennsylvania 17027 / US
 [2005/01]
Representative(s)Jackson, Robert Patrick
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/02]Jackson, Robert Patrick
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2005/01]Dixon, Philip Matthew
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date04253697.921.06.2004
[2005/01]
Priority number, dateUS20030482132P25.06.2003         Original published format: US 482132 P
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1491419
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1491419
Date:20.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:B61F5/12, B61F5/14, B61F5/30
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/01]
TitleGerman:Dreiteiliges Drehgestell zur Beeinflussung des Fahrverhaltens[2005/01]
English:Three-piece motion control truck system[2005/01]
French:Bogie en trois parties pour influencer le style de conduite[2005/01]
Examination procedure29.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
24.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2011Fee for grant paid
03.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
HU20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
LU21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
TR20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
LU21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2013/29]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
LU21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
BG20.07.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2013/25]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
LU21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2013/21]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/23]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
IT20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/20]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
IE21.06.2011
CH30.06.2011
LI30.06.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/11]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
PL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/10]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
RO20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
SK20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
Former [2012/02]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
NL20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT20.04.2011
BE20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT20.04.2011
CY20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY20.04.2011
SI20.04.2011
GR21.07.2011
ES31.07.2011
PT22.08.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/47]PT22.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]CA2396525  (NAT STEEL CAR LTD [CA]) [A] 1,3-6,8,13 * page 15, line 19 - page 19, line 21; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US4938152  (LIST HAROLD A [US]) [A] 1,8,9,13 * column 7, line 64 - column 9, line 5; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US5806435  (PITCHFORD TERRY L [US]) [A] 1,10-13 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 36 * * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 47; figures 4-8 *;
 [A]US5943961  (RUDIBAUGH JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 3-6 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 6; figures 4-11 *
by applicantCA2396525