Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1494486

EP1494486 - Image processing system, projector, information storage medium, and image processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.03.2015  [2015/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/16]For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Masanobu c/o Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2014/16]
Former [2005/01]01 / Kobayashi, Masanobu c/o Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/16]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London
WC1N 2ES / GB
Former [2005/01]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date04253992.401.07.2004
[2005/01]
Priority number, dateJP2003027032002.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003270320
JP2004007841218.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004078412
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1494486
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1494486
Date:22.03.2006
[2006/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1494486
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/31
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/48]
Former [2005/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungssystem, Projektor, Informationsspeichermedium und Bildverarbeitungsverfahren[2005/01]
English:Image processing system, projector, information storage medium, and image processing method[2005/01]
French:Système de traitement d'image, projecteur, support de mémorisation d'information et méthode de traitement d'image[2005/01]
Examination procedure24.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/41]
20.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2014Fee for grant paid
07.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2009
Opposition(s)19.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
05.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO0147259  (JUSTSYSTEM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5,7,8,10,15,17 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 31 * * page 8, line 23 - line 28 * [A] 1,9,11;
 [Y]WO0147285  (JUSTSYSTEM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5,7,8,10,15,17 * page 2, line 5 - line 16 * * page 4, line 7 - line 31 *;
 [A]US2002021418  (RASKAR RAMESH [US]) [A] 1,5,9-11,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US5933132  (MARSHALL ROGER N [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9-11,15 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 25 *;
 [A]JP2002062842
 [X]  - SUKTHANKAR, R; STOCKTON, R.G.; MULLIN, M.D., "Smarter presentations: exploiting homography in camera-projector systems", PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (2001), vol. 1, pages 247 - 253, XP002362832 [X] 1,5-11,15-17 * section 2 -section 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2001.937525
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002062842 A 20020228 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,5,9-11,15 * abstract *
by applicantJP2000241874
 JP2002247614