EP1508400 - A method of manufacturing an article by diffusion bonding and superplastic forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beckford, Peter Rowland Kendomere Trent Lane Weston on Trent Derby, DE72 2BT / GB | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254273.8 | 16.07.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | GB20030018937 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0318937 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508400 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508400 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/04, B21D26/02, B23K20/02, B23K20/18, B23K20/24 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B21D26/055 (EP,US);
B23K20/023 (EP,US);
B23K20/18 (EP,US);
B23K20/24 (EP,US);
B23P15/04 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (EP,US);
F04D29/321 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05D2230/236 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/51] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG | ||
Former [2005/45] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gegenstandes durch Diffusionsschweissen und superplastisches Verformen | [2005/08] | English: | A method of manufacturing an article by diffusion bonding and superplastic forming | [2005/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un objet par soudage par diffusion et formage superplastique | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 24.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0568201 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-26 * figure 5 *; | [AD]GB2306353 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-26 * page 11, lines 20-26 * * figure 10 *; | [A]EP1188497 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-26* figure 2 * |